Ashtead Holdings Inc. v. De Well Container Shipping, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05326 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2022 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant
De Well Container Shipping, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
ASHTEAD HOLDINGS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
58 | 58
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 09/13 6:47 PM
ORDER In light of the parties' representation that this matter has been resolved, see Dkt. 661, In re:One Apus Container Ship Incident on November 30, 2020, 22-MD-3028, the settlement conferencescheduled for September 26, 2024, is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 9/13/2024) (jca) |
|
57 | 57
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 09/13 4:42 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, through their respective counsel, that the above-captioned action (I:22-cv-05326) is voluntarily dismissed in its entirety, including the Complaint, with prejudice and without costs pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/13/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05326-PAE (tg) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 09/13 8:40 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 56 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp) |
||
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Fri 09/13 4:49 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (tg) |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/12 3:28 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) De Well Container Shipping, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Ashtead Holdings Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05326-PAE.(Southwick, Joshua) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/12 9:35 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 55 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/12 9:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Joshua A. Southwick. RE-FILE Document No. (659 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 55 in 1:22-cv-05326-PAE) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05326-PAE(tp) |
||
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/11 6:45 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) De Well Container Shipping, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by ASHTEAD HOLDINGS INC.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05326-PAE.(Southwick, Joshua) |