Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy No. 600230 v. Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05398 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2022 4:23 AM EST |
Defendant
Doe
|
|
Defendant
Expeditors International of Washington Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Stephen M. Uthoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy No. 600230
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Expeditors International Ocean
Terminated: 12/01/2021
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
52 | 52
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 06/28 6:01 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (622 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A.. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 9/6/2024., Motions due by 9/6/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/28/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (tg) |