Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-01210

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 8:22-ap-00122
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2022
Terminated:May 11, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Kastrenakes
1755 McCauley Rd.
Clearwater, FL 33764
Represented By
Amy Denton Mayer
Stichter Riedel Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Edward J. Peterson, III
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Platinum Auto Finance, LLC
Represented By
Platinum Auto Finance, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Maria Kastrenakes
Represented By
Kathleen L DiSanto
Bush Ross, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Zervas
Represented By
Thomas Zervas
contact info
Plaintiff
Kostantinos Papaspanos
Represented By
Kostantinos Papaspanos
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, May 11, 2023
49 49 notice Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Thu 05/11 1:41 PM
Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Attorney Stichter Riedel Blain & Postler, P.A.. (Mayer, Amy)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/11 4:39 PM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-122 Closed. (Anel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
48 48 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 05/09 3:25 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Nicole Noel, Lynn Welter Sherman WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Status Conference - Close Adversary - Case Manager Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
47 47 misc Report (AP) Tue 05/02 2:44 PM
Report on Status Filed by Lynn Welter Sherman on behalf of Original Trustee Traci Stevenson. (Sherman, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/06 9:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #45 )
Monday, April 03, 2023
45 45 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Mon 04/03 11:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 19, 2023
43 43 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/20 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #42 )
Friday, March 17, 2023
42 42 2 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference or Telephonic Status Conference Fri 03/17 3:36 PM
Order Setting Status Conference and Scheduling Deadline for Parties to File Joint Status Report . Status Conference to be held on 5/8/2023 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Laura G.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Tue 03/21 10:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #41 )
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Reassignment of Lead Atty or Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Tue 03/14 2:04 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
41 41 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Mon 03/13 10:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
40 40 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 02/14 3:30 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal by Michael Kastrenakes. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #1 - Continued to 4/10/2023 at 3:30 pm, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 21, 2023
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/22 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #38 )
Thursday, January 19, 2023
38 38 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Thu 01/19 9:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
37 37 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 01/11 11:33 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued to 2/14/2023 at 10:00 am, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given Continued Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal by Michael Kastrenakes. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #1 Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 24, 2022
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/25 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 12/24/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #35 )
Thursday, December 22, 2022
35 35 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Thu 12/22 1:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
34 34 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 12/19 3:22 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Amy Mayer, Ed Peterson, Ben Lambers, Ruediger Mueller, Fred Rudzik, David Jurkiewicz, Ira Silverstein, Jennifer Thomas, John Anthony, Kathleen DiSanto, Kathryn Copeland, Kristian Oldham, Nicole Noel, Nicolette Vilmos, Ryan Mittauer, Sean Wagner, James McAuley, James Sutton, Nicholas Lafalce WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal by Michael Kastrenakes. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #1- All matters continued to 1/11/2023 at 9:30 am, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12/03 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 12/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #32 )
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
32 32 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Wed 11/30 9:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
31 31 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 11/09 11:22 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Nicole Noel, Amy Mayer WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal by Michael Kastrenakes. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #1 - Continued to 12/16/2022 at 10:00 am, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/29 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/28/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #29 )
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
29 29 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Wed 10/26 9:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
28 28 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 10/18 4:43 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Ed Peterson, Amy Mayer, Ruediger Mueller, Kathleen DiSanto, Ben Lambers, John Anthony, Nicholaus Lafalce, Ira Silverstein, Murray Silverstein, Robert George, Nicolette Vilmose, George Zamora, Kathryn Copeland, David Jurkiewicz, Jen Smith Thomas, Blair Boyd, Sean Wagner WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal by Michael Kastrenakes. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #1 - Continued to 11/8/2022 at 2:00 pm, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/24 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #26 )
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
26 26 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Wed 09/21 10:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
25 25 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 09/20 5:34 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Edward Peterson, Mr. and Mrs. Kastrenakes, Amy Mayer, Kathleen DeSantos, John Anthony, Ben Lambers, Stephanie Anthony, Nicholas LaFalce, Nicolette Vilmos, Nicole Noel, Shirley Palumbo, David Jurozwizt, Blair Boyd, Ryan Mittauer, Sean Wagner, Ira Silverstein, Joel Aresty, Catherine Copeland RULING: Continued Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal by Michael Kastrenakes. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #1 - Continued to 10/17/22 at 2:30pm, announced in open court, no further notice given Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/19 12:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
23 23 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Tue 08/16 9:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
22 22 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 08/08 11:25 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Amy Mayer, Nicole Noel WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: (1) Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal by Michael Kastrenakes. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #1- Continued to 9/19/2022 at 3:00 pm, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given *(2) Motion for Remand, For Mandatory Abstention And/Or Permissive Abstention, And For Related Relief, Together With Memorandum Of Law Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Plaintiffs Kostantinos Papaspanos, Thomas Zervas. (Noel, Nicole) Doc #9 - Agreed order submitted O/Signed - Response in Opposition to Thomas Zervas and Konstantinos Papaspanos' Motion for Remand, for Mandatory Abstention and/or Permissive Abstention, and for Related Relief, Together with Memorandum of Law Filed by Edward J. Peterson III on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes Related [+]. (Peterson, Edward). Doc #19 - Opposition Response to Thomas Zervas and Konstantinos Papaspanos' Motion for Remand, for Mandatory Abstention and/or Permissive Abstention, and for Related Relief, Together with Memorandum of Law Filed by Kathleen L DiSanto on behalf of Defendant Maria Kastrenakes. (DiSanto, Kathleen) Doc #20 Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-] 9 9
21 21 order Remand Mon 08/08 10:17 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion For Remand of State Court Civil Action (hearing on the Remand Motion and the Response, which is scheduled for August 8, 2022, is canceled) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Amy Mayer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Susan M.)
Related: [-] 9
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Mon 08/08 10:32 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Edward J. Peterson III on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes Related [+]. (Peterson, Edward)
Related: [-] 21
Monday, August 01, 2022
20 20 answer Response Mon 08/01 3:44 PM
Opposition Response to Thomas Zervas and Konstantinos Papaspanos' Motion for Remand, for Mandatory Abstention and/or Permissive Abstention, and for Related Relief, Together with Memorandum of Law Filed by Kathleen L DiSanto on behalf of Defendant Maria Kastrenakes Related [+]. (DiSanto, Kathleen)
Related: [-] 9
19 19 answer Response Mon 08/01 2:56 PM
Response in Opposition to Thomas Zervas and Konstantinos Papaspanos' Motion for Remand, for Mandatory Abstention and/or Permissive Abstention, and for Related Relief, Together with Memorandum of Law Filed by Edward J. Peterson III on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes Related [+]. (Peterson, Edward) Modified on 8/2/2022 (Eisenhart, Margaret)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
18 18 misc State Court Record (for Notices of Removal) Wed 07/27 12:20 PM
State Court Record - Order Vacating Default Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes Related [+]. (Mayer, Amy)
Related: [-] 1
17 17 misc State Court Record (for Notices of Removal) Wed 07/27 12:19 PM
State Court Record - Motion to Vacate Default Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes Related [+]. (Mayer, Amy)
Related: [-] 1
16 16 misc State Court Record (for Notices of Removal) Wed 07/27 12:17 PM
State Court Record - Clerk's Default and Motion Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes Related [+]. (Mayer, Amy)
Related: [-] 1
15 15 misc State Court Record (for Notices of Removal) Wed 07/27 12:15 PM
State Court Record - Complaint Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes Related [+]. (Mayer, Amy)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, July 22, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 07/22 2:49 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Plaintiffs Kostantinos Papaspanos, Thomas Zervas Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2022 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Noel, Nicole)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 07/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 07/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
court ADI - Reminder to Prepare and Serve Notice of Hearing Wed 07/20 11:45 PM
Nicole Mariani Noel is reminded to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties. Re: Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 08/08/2022 9:30 am Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Re: Motion for Remand, For Mandatory Abstention And/Or Permissive Abstention, And For Related Relief, Together With Memorandum Of Law Doc9 . Failure to do so will result in the cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Mon 07/18 11:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 17, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Thu 07/21 4:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/17/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Friday, July 15, 2022
10 10 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Fri 07/15 9:33 AM
Notice Rescheduling Hearing the Pretrial Conference on the Notice of Removal and the Motion to Remand Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2022 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Lisa M.)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Fri 07/15 9:51 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 08/08/2022 9:30 am Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Re: Motion for Remand, For Mandatory Abstention And/Or Permissive Abstention, And For Related Relief, Together With Memorandum Of Law Doc9 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : Nicole Mariani Noel is directed to prepare, file and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, the notice must be done immediately. Failure to comply with this instruction will result in cancellation of the hearing on this specific matter. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
9 9 motion Motion for Remand (AP) Tue 07/12 9:56 AM
Motion for Remand , For Mandatory Abstention And/Or Permissive Abstention, And For Related Relief, Together With Memorandum Of Law Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Plaintiffs Kostantinos Papaspanos, Thomas Zervas. (Noel, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 03, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 07/06 11:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 07/03/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Friday, July 01, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sat 07/02 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
6 6 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Fri 07/01 12:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
5 5 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 06/29 9:55 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/19/2022 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Robert)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/28 4:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kathleen L DiSanto on behalf of Defendant Maria Kastrenakes. (DiSanto, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 06/27 1:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of the Debtor Filed by Edward J. Peterson III on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes. (Peterson, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 06/27 1:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of the Debtor Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Defendant Michael Kastrenakes. (Mayer, Amy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp ADI - Notice of Removal Mon 06/27 1:26 PM
Notice of Removal by Michael Kastrenakes . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Mayer, Amy)
Related: [-]