Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 8:22-bk-01210
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago
Friday, January 13, 2023
238 238 court Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Fri 01/13 10:16 AM
Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript to be filed within 7 calendar days of the date of service of this notice, but an additional three days may be added if the notice is served by U.S. Mail Related [+]. (Lisa P.)
Related: [-] 237
Thursday, January 12, 2023
237 237 court Transcript Thu 01/12 1:35 PM
Transcript Regarding Hearing Held 12-16-22 on Numerous calendar items as listed in Hearing Proceeding Memo at Doc. #223. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Johnson Transcription Service: 813-920-1466 . Transcript access will be restricted through 04/12/2023. (Johnson Transcription Service)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
239 239 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Fri 01/13 11:20 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - ***AMENDED PROCEEDING MEMO (Amended to reflect case converting to a Chapter 7)*** APPEARANCES: Ben Lambers, David Jurkiewicz, Ira Silverstein, Nicholas Lafalce, Kathleen DiSanto, Kristian Oldham, Nicolette Vilmos, Amy Mayer, Ryan Mittauer WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Status Conference on - Case Converted to a Chapter 7 case (creditor's motions at Doc. 225 and 231, debtor did not oppose) - enter form order O/Case Manager **All other matters continued to 2/14/2023 at 10:00 am, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given** ~(1) Continued Confirmation Hearing - Objection to Confirmation of Debtor's Plan of Reorganization and Objection of Adequacy of Disclosure Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Panayiotis Vasiloudes Related [+]. (Anthony, John) Doc #103 - Joinder Notice In Omitted Creditors' Objection To Adequacy of Disclosure and to Confirmation of Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Creditor Thomas Zervas And Konstantinos Papaspanos. (Noel, Nicole) Doc #138 - Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by James Randolph Liebler II on behalf of Creditor Westlake Flooring Company, LLC.(Liebler, James) Doc #140 - Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #177 - Objection to Confirmation of Debtor's Unopposed First Amendment to Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Filed by Robert Bruce George on behalf of Creditor First Home Bank. (George, Robert) Doc #180 - Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Objection to Disclosure Statement Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc..(Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #141 *(2) Continued Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 11 filed by NextGear Capital, Inc.. Contains negative notice. Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes (Mayer, Amy) Doc #127 - Response to Debtor's Objection to Claim No. 11 Filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Jurkiewicz, David) Doc #148 *(3) Continued Motion to Consolidate Objection to Claim No. 11 in 8:22-bk-1210-CED with Complaint in Adversary Case No. 8:22-ap-112-CED Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes (Mayer, Amy) Doc #152 (4) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 16 of Trifon Houvardas. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #168 *(5) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 17 of Cygram Holdings, L.P.. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #169 (6) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 18 of Cygram Heritage, LLLP. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #170 (7) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 19 of Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #171 (8) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 20 of Cygram Heritage, LLLP. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #172 (9) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 15 of K&M Insurance Investors, LLC. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #173 - Response to NextGear Claim Objections Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of K&M Insurance Investors, LLC, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Derivatively, on behalf of New Wave Acceptance, LLC, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Trifon Houvardas, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Panayiotis Vasiloudes. (Anthony, John) Doc #174 (10) Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement. Related Case and Parties: Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, LLC, Trifon Houvardas, and K&M Insurance Investors, LLC and related adversary proceedings.. Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes (Mayer, Amy) Doc #178 - Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise with Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, LLC, Trifon Houvardas, and K&M Insurance Investors, LLC Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #192 - Supplemental Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise with Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, LLC, Trifon Houvardas, and K&M Insurance Investors, LLC - Bankruptcy Rule 6004 Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #198 - Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise with Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, LLC, Trifon Houvardas, and K&M Insurance Investors, LLC Filed by Robert Bruce George on behalf of Creditor First Home Bank. (George, Robert) Doc #199 (11) Priority Status Continued Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 2 filed by State of Florida - Department of Revenue. Contains negative notice. Filed by Edward J. Peterson III on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes (Peterson, Edward) Doc #136 - Response to Objection to Claim No. 2 Filed by Kristian S Oldham on behalf of Creditor State Of Florida Dept. of Revenue (LL). (Oldham, Kristian) Doc #154 - Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Claim No. 2 of the Florida Department of Revenue Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #188 - Memorandum In support of Claim No.2 Filed by Frederick F Rudzik on behalf of Creditor State Of Florida Dept. of Revenue (LL). (Rudzik, Frederick) Doc #210 - Response to Reply Brief: (I) in Support of (A) Debtors Objection to Claim No. 2 Filed by the State of Florida-Department of Revenue; and (B) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Claim No. 2 of the Florida Department of Revenue and (II) in Opposition to the Memorandum of Law in Support of the Priority Portion of Claim No. 2 Filed by the Florida Department of Revenue Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #218 (12) Motion for Protective Order and Omnibus Objection to NextGear Discovery Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of Panevas, L.L.C., Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Trifon Houvardas, K&M Insurance Investors, LLC, Panayiotis Vasiloudes (Anthony, John) Doc #194 - Response to Vasiloudes Creditors' Omnibus Objection to NextGear Discovery and Motion for Protective Order Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #206 (13) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 14 of First Home Bank. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #167 - Response to Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.'s Objection to Claim No. 14 Filed by Robert Bruce George on behalf of Creditor First Home Bank. (George, Robert) Doc #207 (14) Amended Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 13 of CPX Holdings, LLC. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #176 - Opposition Response to NextGear Capital, Inc.'s Amended Objection to Claim No. 13 filed by CPX Holdings, LLC Filed by Kathleen L DiSanto on behalf of Creditor CPX Holdings, LLC. (DiSanto, Kathleen) Doc #209 *(15) Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, L.L.C., Panayiotis Vasiloudes (Doc #225). * Motion for Relief from Stay. (Fee Paid.) Re: 2017 SAILFISH 325 DC, VIN YSIX0040C717. Filed by Toni Townsend on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (Townsend, Toni) Doc #227 *$Preliminary Hearing on Amended Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 (Verify Fee). Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Jurkiewicz, David) Doc #231 Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-] 96 103 96 164 164 96 127 168 , 170 , 171 , 173 , 172 , 169 178 178 178 136 136 136 188 , 210 194 167 166 176 225
Att: 1 Exhibit A PNLSA
Att: 2 Exhibit B Personal Guaranty
Att: 3 Exhibit C UCC1 2018
Att: 4 Exhibit D POC
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A - NextGear Discovery
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
236 236 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 01/11 11:28 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Ben Lambers, David Jurkiewicz, Ira Silverstein, Nicholas Lafalce, Kathleen DiSanto, Kristian Oldham, Nicolette Vilmos, Amy Mayer, Ryan Mittauer WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Status Conference on - Case Converted to a Chapter 11 case (creditor's motions at Doc. 225 and 231, debtor did not oppose) - enter form order O/Case Manager **All other matters continued to 2/14/2023 at 10:00 am, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given** ~(1) Continued Confirmation Hearing - Objection to Confirmation of Debtor's Plan of Reorganization and Objection of Adequacy of Disclosure Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Panayiotis Vasiloudes Related [+]. (Anthony, John) Doc #103 - Joinder Notice In Omitted Creditors' Objection To Adequacy of Disclosure and to Confirmation of Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Creditor Thomas Zervas And Konstantinos Papaspanos. (Noel, Nicole) Doc #138 - Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by James Randolph Liebler II on behalf of Creditor Westlake Flooring Company, LLC.(Liebler, James) Doc #140 - Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #177 - Objection to Confirmation of Debtor's Unopposed First Amendment to Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Filed by Robert Bruce George on behalf of Creditor First Home Bank. (George, Robert) Doc #180 - Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Objection to Disclosure Statement Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc..(Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #141 *(2) Continued Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 11 filed by NextGear Capital, Inc.. Contains negative notice. Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes (Mayer, Amy) Doc #127 - Response to Debtor's Objection to Claim No. 11 Filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Jurkiewicz, David) Doc #148 *(3) Continued Motion to Consolidate Objection to Claim No. 11 in 8:22-bk-1210-CED with Complaint in Adversary Case No. 8:22-ap-112-CED Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes (Mayer, Amy) Doc #152 (4) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 16 of Trifon Houvardas. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #168 *(5) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 17 of Cygram Holdings, L.P.. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #169 (6) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 18 of Cygram Heritage, LLLP. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #170 (7) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 19 of Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #171 (8) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 20 of Cygram Heritage, LLLP. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #172 (9) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 15 of K&M Insurance Investors, LLC. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #173 - Response to NextGear Claim Objections Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of K&M Insurance Investors, LLC, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Derivatively, on behalf of New Wave Acceptance, LLC, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Trifon Houvardas, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Panayiotis Vasiloudes. (Anthony, John) Doc #174 (10) Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement. Related Case and Parties: Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, LLC, Trifon Houvardas, and K&M Insurance Investors, LLC and related adversary proceedings.. Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes (Mayer, Amy) Doc #178 - Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise with Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, LLC, Trifon Houvardas, and K&M Insurance Investors, LLC Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #192 - Supplemental Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise with Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, LLC, Trifon Houvardas, and K&M Insurance Investors, LLC - Bankruptcy Rule 6004 Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #198 - Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise with Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, LLC, Trifon Houvardas, and K&M Insurance Investors, LLC Filed by Robert Bruce George on behalf of Creditor First Home Bank. (George, Robert) Doc #199 (11) Priority Status Continued Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 2 filed by State of Florida - Department of Revenue. Contains negative notice. Filed by Edward J. Peterson III on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes (Peterson, Edward) Doc #136 - Response to Objection to Claim No. 2 Filed by Kristian S Oldham on behalf of Creditor State Of Florida Dept. of Revenue (LL). (Oldham, Kristian) Doc #154 - Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Claim No. 2 of the Florida Department of Revenue Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #188 - Memorandum In support of Claim No.2 Filed by Frederick F Rudzik on behalf of Creditor State Of Florida Dept. of Revenue (LL). (Rudzik, Frederick) Doc #210 - Response to Reply Brief: (I) in Support of (A) Debtors Objection to Claim No. 2 Filed by the State of Florida-Department of Revenue; and (B) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Claim No. 2 of the Florida Department of Revenue and (II) in Opposition to the Memorandum of Law in Support of the Priority Portion of Claim No. 2 Filed by the Florida Department of Revenue Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes. (Mayer, Amy) Doc #218 (12) Motion for Protective Order and Omnibus Objection to NextGear Discovery Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of Panevas, L.L.C., Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Trifon Houvardas, K&M Insurance Investors, LLC, Panayiotis Vasiloudes (Anthony, John) Doc #194 - Response to Vasiloudes Creditors' Omnibus Objection to NextGear Discovery and Motion for Protective Order Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #206 (13) Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 14 of First Home Bank. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #167 - Response to Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.'s Objection to Claim No. 14 Filed by Robert Bruce George on behalf of Creditor First Home Bank. (George, Robert) Doc #207 (14) Amended Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 13 of CPX Holdings, LLC. Contains negative notice. Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Doc #176 - Opposition Response to NextGear Capital, Inc.'s Amended Objection to Claim No. 13 filed by CPX Holdings, LLC Filed by Kathleen L DiSanto on behalf of Creditor CPX Holdings, LLC. (DiSanto, Kathleen) Doc #209 *(15) Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Panevas, L.L.C., Panayiotis Vasiloudes (Doc #225). * Motion for Relief from Stay. (Fee Paid.) Re: 2017 SAILFISH 325 DC, VIN YSIX0040C717. Filed by Toni Townsend on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (Townsend, Toni) Doc #227 *$Preliminary Hearing on Amended Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 (Verify Fee). Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Jurkiewicz, David) Doc #231 Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-] 96 103 96 164 164 96 127 168 , 170 , 171 , 173 , 172 , 169 178 178 178 136 136 136 188 , 210 194 167 166 176 225
Att: 1 Exhibit A PNLSA
Att: 2 Exhibit B Personal Guaranty
Att: 3 Exhibit C UCC1 2018
Att: 4 Exhibit D POC
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A - NextGear Discovery
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
235 235 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Tue 01/10 4:55 PM
Notice of Proposed Agenda for January 11, 2023 Hearing Filed by Amy Denton Mayer on behalf of Debtor Michael Kastrenakes. (Mayer, Amy)
Related: [-]
234 234 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Tue 01/10 10:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court Request for Audio Recording of Proceeding Tue 01/10 11:18 AM
Request for Audio Recording of Proceeding. Proceeding held: 12/16/2022. (Johnson Transcription Service)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Tue 01/10 11:20 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Request for Audio Recording of Proceeding([LINK:8:22-bk-01210-CED] ) [court,reqaudio] ( 32.00). Receipt Number A71590553, Amount Paid $ 32.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
233 233 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Mon 01/09 2:00 PM
Notice of Hearing on Amended Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 Filed by Nicolette C Vilmos on behalf of Creditor NextGear Capital, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 1/11/2023 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Vilmos, Nicolette)
Related: [-] 231
court ADI - Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day Mon 01/09 12:16 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order232 is not indicated on the docket. Toni Townsend is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Mon 01/09 9:01 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 01/11/2023 09:30 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Re: Amended Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 (Verify Fee). Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Doc231 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : David J. Jurkiewicz is directed to prepare, file and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, the notice must be done immediately. Failure to comply with this instruction will result in cancellation of the hearing on this specific matter. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 231