Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-04177

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:22-ap-00033
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2022
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Peggy Jane Mccoy
139 Cox Road
Jonesville, VA 24263
Represented By
Peggy Jane Mccoy
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth Ray McCoy
139 Cox Road
Jonesville, VA 34263
Represented By
Kenneth Ray McCoy
contact info
Defendant
Project 14 Global Missions
5810 Shelby Oaks Drive Suite B
Memphis, TN 38134
Represented By
Project 14 Global Missions
contact info
Defendant
Iron Lending, LLC
7901 Strickland Road Suite 108 Attn: Jason McCoy
Raleigh, NC 27615
Represented By
Iron Lending, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean C. Southard
as Liquidating Trustee % Daniel Sparks, Bill Bensinger 1800 Financial Center 505 N. 20th Street
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Bradley Richard Hightower
Christian & Small LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Saturday, November 09, 2024
64 64 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 11/09 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 63 Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, November 07, 2024
63 63 court Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/07 7:50 AM
Clerk's Notice of Dismissal and Closing of Adversary Proceeding (cmh)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/07 8:07 AM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-33 Closed (cmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
62 62 court Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/06 3:11 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal By Iron Lending, LLC, Kenneth Ray McCoy, Peggy Jane Mccoy, Project 14 Global Missions and Between Plaintiff Sean C. Southard Filed by Defendants Iron Lending, LLC, Kenneth Ray McCoy, Peggy Jane Mccoy, Project 14 Global Missions. (Prueter, Charles)
Related: [-]