LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL CARGO SERVICE, INC.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-06384 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:741 Shipping (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2023 4:57 AM EST |
Defendant
American International Cargo Service Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Hapag-Lloyd A.G.
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
JESSICA SHIP HOLDINGS S.A.
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
M/V ONE Apus
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
American International Cargo Service Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/14 12:27 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Kenderick M. Jordan is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel of record for Defendant, American International Cargo Service, Inc. and shall be removed from the CM/ECF electronic distribution list. Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/2024) (jca) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/13 1:09 PM
MOTION for Kenderick M. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by American International Cargo Service Inc...(Jordan, Kenderick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel |