Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. American Commercial Transport, Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-06386 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2023 4:44 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Shine Shipping Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Hyundai Merchant Marine CO Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Pronto Great China Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rohlig USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sealink International, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tianshi Logistics Co., Limited
|
|
Defendant
Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cargo World, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Annex Global Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UPS Asia Group Pte Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Commercial Transport, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Global Logistics, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Hyundai Merchant Marine CO Ltd
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Yang Ming (America) Corporation
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
HMM Co Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Hapag-Lloyd A.G.
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
ROES 1-10, inclusive
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Shine Shipping Ltd
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Roes 1-10
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Roes 1 through 10
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Roes
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Pronto Great China Corp
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
UPS Asia Group Pte Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Annex Global Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
American Commercial Transport, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Translink Shipping Inc.
Terminated: 10/25/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
196 | 196
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/14 12:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re:195 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kenderick M. Jordan is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel of record for Plaintiff, TopOcean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc. and shall be removed from the CM/ECF electronic distribution list. Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/2024) (tro) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
195 | 195
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/13 12:38 PM
MOTION for Kenderick M. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc...(Jordan, Kenderick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel |