MSIG Mingtai Insurance Company, Ltd. v. M/V One Apus et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-07368 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2023 3:46 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
Apex Maritime Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Starlink Freight System (SFO) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Chidori Ship Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Jessica Ship Holding S.A
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
M/V One Apus
|
|
Cross Defendant
Ocean Network Express, PTE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Apex Maritime Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chidori Ship Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jessica Ship Holding S.A
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M/V One Apus
|
|
Defendant
Ocean Network Express, PTE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Starlink Freight System (SFO) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MSIG Mingtai Insurance Company, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
67 | 67
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 06/28 6:01 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (622 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A.. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 9/6/2024., Motions due by 9/6/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/28/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (tg) |