Makely v. United States Air Force
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick R Wyrick |
Case #: | 5:22-cv-00785 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1346 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 02, 2023 5:58 AM CST |
Defendant
United States Air Force
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Faith Makely
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
Transcript Letter
Fri 08/02 11:11 AM
TRANSCRIPT LETTER advising no transcripts are necessary re18 Notice of Appeal filed by Faith Makely. The record is ready for appeal purposes. (kb) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Transcript Order Form
Tue 07/30 8:07 PM
TRANSCRIPT Order Form by Faith Makely re18 Notice of Appeal that transcripts are not necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. (McKeever, Terry) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 07/16 1:50 PM
Tenth Circuit USCA Case Number 24-6142 for18 Notice of Appeal filed by Faith Makely. Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2024. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 07/30/2024 for Faith Makely. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2024 for United States of America. 24-6142 (naa) |
|
19 | 19
appeal
Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit
Tue 07/16 10:05 AM
PRELIMINARY RECORD LETTER - Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal with Preliminary Record sent to Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals re18 Notice of Appeal(naa) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Preliminary Record on Appeal | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/15 6:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to17 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Leave to, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,, by Faith Makely. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AOKWDC-4474858. (McKeever, Terry) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Leave to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 05/15 11:15 AM
ORDER denying15 plaintiff's motion for leave to file corrected motion to amend her complaint or, in the alternative, file her motion out of time and dismissing without prejudice (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 5/15/2024. (ks) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/09 12:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Amended Complaint as Motion to Amend MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Amend out of TIme MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion To Amend Complaint filed by United States Air Force.(Evans, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Notice of Elec. Filing for Amended Complaint [Doc. 14] & email correspondence, Mar. 25-28, 2024 | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Amend/Correct Leave Extension of Time
Thu 03/28 1:37 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Amended Complaint as Motion to Amend , MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Amend out of TIme , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion To Amend Complaint by Faith Makely.(McKeever, Terry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion to File Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/25 10:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Faith Makely filed by Faith Makely.(McKeever, Terry) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 02/09 2:55 PM
ORDER granting9 the United States's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 2/9/2024. (ks) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/04 4:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed by United States Air Force. (Evans, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/27 11:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed by All Plaintiffs. (McKeever, Terry) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/27 4:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Makely. United States Air Force served on 1/3/2023.(McKeever, Terry) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment USPS Delivery Confirmation | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 04/06 12:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) by United States Air Force. (Evans, Robert) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 02/27 5:06 PM
ORDER granting7 the United States' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 2/27/2023. (ks) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 02/24 2:39 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by United States Air Force. (Evans, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 02/24 10:49 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Don Evans, Jr on behalf of United States Air Force (Evans, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/13 3:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Makely. United States Air Force served on 12/30/2022.(McKeever, Terry) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/13 2:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Makely. United States Air Force served on 1/3/2023.(McKeever, Terry) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Signed Certified Mail Return Receipt | ||
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 09/06 11:55 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Terry M McKeever on behalf of Faith Makely (McKeever, Terry) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/06 9:17 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Air Force. (so) |
|
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Tue 09/06 10:26 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3985241. (McKeever, Terry) |
||
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/06 9:09 AM
COMPLAINT against United States Air Force filed by Faith Makely.(so) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |