Makely v. United States
Original Case: 5:22-cv-00785
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-06142 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 18, 2024 2:30 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
FAITH MAKELY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/18/2024 2:30 AM MDT |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
[11105178] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert Don Evans, Jr. for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/16/2024. Manner of Service: email. 24-6142 --[Edited 07/17/2024 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/17/24] RDE | ||
[11105022] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2024. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 07/30/2024 for Faith Makely. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2024 for United States of America. 24-6142 | ||
Att: 1 8 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |