Martin Akerman v. Lloyd Austin, III
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00696
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv.us-02066 |
Type | civil u.s. / united states |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 30, 2023 4:19 PM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, Secretary of Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTINE WORMUTH, Secretary of the Army
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FRANK KENDALL, Secretary of the Air Force
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GENERAL DANIEL R. HOKANSON, Chief, National Guard Bureau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARTIN AKERMAN
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 29 2023
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00696-LMB-WEF. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001429243] [22-2066, 22-2147, 22-2154] |
Docket last updated: 01/16/2024 4:39 PM EST |
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00696-LMB-WEF. Case manager: CPoulsen. [1001245883] 22-2066 CP [Entered: 10/12/2022 10:19 AM] | |
2 | 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Martin Akerman - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/14/2022. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00696-LMB-WEF. Mailed to: Martin Akerman. [1001245895] 22-2066 CP [Entered: 10/12/2022 10:21 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Fee Notice | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs IFP Application | ||
3 | 3 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Martin Akerman. [1001245907] Informal Opening Brief due 11/07/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 22-2066 CP [Entered: 10/12/2022 10:27 AM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001245912]. Due: 10/26/2022. 22-2066 CP [Entered: 10/12/2022 10:30 AM] | |
5 | 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00696-LMB-WEF. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001246182] 22-2066 CP [Entered: 10/12/2022 12:53 PM] |