Akerman v. Austin et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00696 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2022 |
Case in other court: | 4th Circuit, 22-02066 4th Circuit, 22-02147 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 18, 2023 8:20 PM EDT |
Defendant
General Daniel R. Hokanson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Kendall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christine E. Wormuth
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lloyd J. Austin, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Defense counterintelligence and Security Agency
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of the Air Force
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of the Army
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Akerman
2001 North Adam Street Unit 440
Arlington, VA 22201 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
117 | 117
appeal
Appeal Remark
Tue 04/23 3:04 PM
SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari is denied. 04/22/2024. 23-7072 (swil) |