Martin Akerman v. Lloyd Austin, III
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00696
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv.us-02147 |
Type | civil u.s. / united states |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 09, 2022 3:27 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, Secretary of Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTINE WORMUTH, Secretary of the Army
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FRANK KENDALL, Secretary of the Air Force
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GENERAL DANIEL R. HOKANSON, Chief, National Guard Bureau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARTIN AKERMAN
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 29 2023
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00696-LMB-WEF. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001429243] [22-2066, 22-2147, 22-2154] |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 7:28 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 08, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00696-LMB-WEF. Case manager: CPoulsen. [1001262758] 22-2147 CP [Entered: 11/08/2022 12:18 PM] | |
2 | 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001262760] Informal Opening Brief due 12/02/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 22-2147 CP [Entered: 11/08/2022 12:22 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001262764]. Due: 11/22/2022. 22-2147 CP [Entered: 11/08/2022 12:25 PM] |