Roe v. Marshall University Board of Governors
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert C Chambers |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00532 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1981 Sex Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2023 4:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Marshall University Board of Governors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Roe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
216 | 216
appeal
Transcript - Appeal
Thu 08/29 3:23 PM
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT FILED of Motion Hearing for dates of 6/20/2024, before Judge Robert C. Chambers, re206 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA, Court Reporter Carol Adams, Telephone number 304-528-2244. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? - y. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/9/2024. Redaction Request due 9/19/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2024. (cla) |