Jane Roe v. Marshall University Board of Governors
Original Case: 3:22-cv-00532
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01669 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 6:23 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
MARSHALL UNIVERSITY BOARD OF GOVERNORS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JANE ROE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/23/2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:22-cv-00532. Case manager: KHancock. [1001604682] 24-1669 KH [Entered: 07/22/2024 12:37 PM] | |
2 | 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 3:22-cv-00532. Mailed to: Zachary Taylor Ramey, Kayla S. Reynolds. [1001604699] 24-1669 KH [Entered: 07/22/2024 12:49 PM] |