Gabaldon v. New Mexico State Police et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Judith C Herrera |
Referred: | Steven C Yarbrough |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00035 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Second Judicial District Court, D-202-CV-22-02249 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2023 3:14 AM MDT |
Defendant
New Mexico State Police
Robles, Rael & Anaya, P.C. 500 Marquette Ave, NW Suite 700
Albuquerque, NM 87102 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kurtis Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Gabaldon
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Does 1-4
Terminated: 06/01/2023
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
94 | 94 NOTICE TO USCA that Record is Complete re89 Notice of Appeal,. (bap) | |
93 | 93 LETTER from USCA Notice sent to Clerk of District Court that ROA completion notice has not been received. Notice due that record is complete by 08/30/2024 re89 Notice of Appeal. (bap) |