Gabaldon v. New Mexico State Police, et al
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00035
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02104 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 2:18 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
NEW MEXICO STATE POLICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN SMITH, in his individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KURTIS WARD, in his individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CRAIG GABALDON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/26/2024 2:18 AM MDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
[11107339] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/24/2024. Docketing statement due 08/07/2024 for Craig Gabaldon. Transcript order form due 08/07/2024 for Craig Gabaldon. Notice of appearance due on 08/07/2024 for Craig Gabaldon, New Mexico State Police, Kevin Smith and Kurtis Ward 24-2104 | ||
Att: 1 65 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |