New York Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:23-bk-10244
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York
40 North Main street
Albany, NY 12203
Represented By
Francis J. Brennan
Nolan Heller Kauffman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Leo W. O'Brien Federal Building 11A Clinton Ave, Room 620
Albany, NY 12207

Docket last updated: 03/31/2023 6:03 PM EDT
Friday, March 31, 2023
72 72 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/31 3:17 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by Andrew Mina Filed by on behalf of London Market Insurers. (Mina, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
71 71 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 03/30 4:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by Jeff D. Kahane Filed by on behalf of London Market Insurers. (Kahane, Jeff)
Related: [-]
70 70 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 03/30 9:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Justin A. Heller Filed by on behalf of The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York. (Heller, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
69 69 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/29 4:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by Catalina J. Sugayan Filed by on behalf of London Market Insurers. (Sugayan, Catalina)
Related: [-]
68 68 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/29 4:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by Yongli Yang Filed by on behalf of London Market Insurers. (Yang, Yongli)
Related: [-]
67 67 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 03/29 3:03 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Didonna, Edward)
Related: [-] 56
66 66 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 03/29 3:03 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Didonna, Edward)
Related: [-] 57
65 65 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 03/29 3:02 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Didonna, Edward)
Related: [-] 58
64 64 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 03/29 3:01 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Didonna, Edward)
Related: [-] 59
63 63 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 03/29 2:58 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Didonna, Edward)
Related: [-] 60
62 62 motion Employ Wed 03/29 12:32 PM
Application to Employ TOBIN AND DEMPF, LLP as SPECIAL LITIGATION COUNSEL Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York. (Brennan, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of Michael L. Costello
61 61 motion Employ Wed 03/29 12:29 PM
Ex Parte Application to Employ BLANK ROME, LLP as SPECIAL INSURANCE COUNSEL Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York. (Brennan, Francis) Modified on 3/29/2023 (Weiler, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of James R. Murray, Esq.
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
60 60 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 03/28 2:43 PM
Motion for Catalina J. Sugayan to Appear pro hac vice Filed by London Market Insurers . (Straile, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Cover Letter
59 59 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 03/28 2:40 PM
Motion for Yongli Yang to Appear pro hac vice Filed by London Market Insurers . (Straile, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Cover Letter
58 58 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 03/28 2:38 PM
Motion for Andrew E. Mina to Appear pro hac vice Filed by London Market Insurers . (Straile, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Cover Letter
57 57 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 03/28 2:35 PM
Motion for Russell W. Roten to Appear pro hac vice Filed by London Market Insurers . (Straile, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Cover Letter
56 56 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 03/28 2:30 PM
Motion for Jeff D. Kahane to Appear pro hac vice Filed by London Market Insurers . (Straile, T) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2023 (Straile, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
55 55 order Interim Order Tue 03/28 10:16 AM
Interim Order GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER TO PURSUANT TO FEDERALRULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 1007(c) and 9006(b)(1) TO EXTEND TIMETO FILE SCHEDULES OF ASSETS AND LIABILITIES, SCHEDULE OF CURRENTINCOME AND EXPENDITURES, SCHEDULES OF EXECUTORY CONTRACTS ANDUNEXPIRED LEASES AND STATEMENT OF FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Related [+]. (Bazan, Judy)
Related: [-] 32
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 03/28 2:33 PM
Receipt Number 500000219, Fee Amount $100.00 RECEIPTED IN DISTRICT COURT Related [+]. (Straile, T)
Related: [-] 56
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 03/28 2:36 PM
Receipt Number 500000218, Fee Amount $100.00 RECEIPTED IN DISTRICT COURT Related [+]. (Straile, T)
Related: [-] 57
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 03/28 2:39 PM
Receipt Number 500000217, Fee Amount $100.00 RECEIPTED IN DISTRICT COURT Related [+]. (Straile, T)
Related: [-] 58
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 03/28 2:41 PM
Receipt Number 500000215, Fee Amount $100.00 RECEIPTED IN DISTRICT COURT Related [+]. (Straile, T)
Related: [-] 59
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 03/28 2:46 PM
Receipt Number 500000216, Fee Amount $100.00 RECEIPTED IN DISTRICT COURT Related [+]. (Straile, T)
Related: [-] 60
Monday, March 27, 2023
54 54 audio Tue 03/28 6:00 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [03/27/2023 11:01:29 AM]. File Size [ 1961 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:19 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
53 53 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 03/27 5:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Taylor Stippel Filed by on behalf of Certain Personal Injury Creditors. (Stippel, Taylor)
Related: [-]
52 52 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 03/27 1:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Brett L Messinger Filed by on behalf of London Market Insurers. (Messinger, Brett)
Related: [-]
court zCHAP Event-Hearing Continued Motion (BK) Mon 03/27 3:10 PM
Hearing Held; INTERIM ORDER DUE and Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 02:00 PM at Albany CourtRoom. (OConnell, Theresa)
Related: [-] 32
court Hearing Set(Motion) Mon 03/27 3:48 PM
Hearing RE-Set to add to calendar Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/3/2023 at 11:00 AM at Albany CourtRoom. (OConnell, Theresa)
Related: [-] 10 ,12
court Hearing Set(Motion) Mon 03/27 3:52 PM
Hearing RE-Set to add to calendar Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2023 at 02:00 PM at Albany CourtRoom. (OConnell, Theresa)
Related: [-] 8 ,9 ,11
Saturday, March 25, 2023
51 51 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 03/26 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 45
Friday, March 24, 2023
50 50 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/24 5:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeffrey Robert Anderson Filed by on behalf of Certain Personal Injury Creditors. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
49 49 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/24 5:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by M. Paul Gorfinkel Filed by on behalf of Interstate Fire and Casualty Company. (Gorfinkel, M. Paul)
Related: [-]
48 48 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 03/24 2:22 PM
Affidavit of Service Via Certified, U.S. Regular Mail and Email Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York Related [+]. (Brennan, Francis)
Related: [-] 10 ,9 ,41 ,40 ,39 ,11 ,8 ,38
47 47 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 03/24 2:15 PM
Affidavit of Service Via Regular Mail and Email Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York Related [+]. (Brennan, Francis)
Related: [-] 42
46 46 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/24 12:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for Service of Papers by Stuart S. Mermelstein Filed by on behalf of Certain Personal Injury Creditors. (Mermelstein, Stuart)
Related: [-]