The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York v. Winner et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10244
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10244
New York Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert E Littlefield Jr |
Case #: | 1:23-ap-90005 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sharon Winner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shannon Webb
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jasmatie Tennassee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dylan Custer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deana Wasson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barbara Dalmata
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raymond Dalmata
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 1
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 2
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LG 68 Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York
40 North Main Avenue
Albany, NY 12203 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/13 9:59 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/13 9:58 AM
Stipulation By The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York and Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany NY and LG 68 Doe. Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/07 12:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/07 12:36 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York. (Brennan, Francis) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Letter (generic)
Fri 07/07 10:46 AM
Letter Filed by Merson Law, PLLC . (Bazan, Judy) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Letter (generic)
Thu 06/22 11:26 AM
Letter Withdrawing Re: NOTIFICATION OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) Modified on 6/22/2023 (Davis, Darcy) |
|
court
Hearing Not Held (BK)
Thu 06/22 12:31 PM
Hearing Not Held. WITHDRAWN . (OConnell, Theresa) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/21 4:16 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by The Official Committee of Tort Claimants . (Kugler, Robert) |
|
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/21 4:14 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by LG 68 Doe.(Keller, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
30 | 30
answer
Objection
Wed 06/21 4:11 PM
Objection to Filed by LG 68 Doe. (Keller, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
29 | 29
misc
Declaration
Wed 06/21 4:04 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Edwin H. Caldie in Support of the Official Committee of Tort Claimants' Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under §§ 105(a) and 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Enjoining the Prosecution of State Court Actions Against Non-Debtor Entities Filed by The Official Committee of Tort Claimants . (Kugler, Robert) |
|
28 | 28
answer
Response
Wed 06/21 3:57 PM
Response to Filed by The Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Kugler, Robert) |
|
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Wed 06/21 3:06 PM
Hearing RE-SET TO ADD TO CALENDAR . Hearing scheduled for 6/28/2023 at 10:30 AM at Albany CourtRoom. (OConnell, Theresa) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 06/20 4:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Logan Kugler Filed by on behalf of The Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Kugler, Logan) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 06/20 4:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Edwin H. Caldie Filed by on behalf of The Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Caldie, Edwin) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 06/20 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert T Kugler Filed by on behalf of The Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Kugler, Robert) |
|
24 | 24
court
Transcript
Tue 06/20 11:46 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 6/14/2023. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING, TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 9/18/2023. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, LLC, Telephone number 800-257-0885. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/27/2023. Redaction Request Due By 7/11/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/21/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/18/2023. (Smith, Nicole) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
audio
Thu 06/15 6:00 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [06/14/2023 11:11:21 AM]. File Size [ 6107 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:26:20 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Wed 06/14 2:25 PM
Hearing Held; GRANTED . Order due by 07/14/2023. (OConnell, Theresa) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter (generic)
Fri 06/09 12:16 PM
Letter Re: Defendants' Counsel information Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York. (Brennan, Francis) |
|
utility
Add Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:34 PM
Attorney Mario D Cometti for Shannon Webb and Sharon Winner added to case. (Didonna, Edward) |
||
utility
Add Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:38 PM
Attorney Paul E. DeLorenzo for Jasmatie Tennassee added to case. (Didonna, Edward) |
||
utility
Add Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:41 PM
Attorney Joshua D Lindy for Dylan Custer added to case. (Didonna, Edward) |
||
utility
Add Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:43 PM
Attorney Robert Abdella for Deana Wasson added to case. (Didonna, Edward) |
||
utility
Add Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:45 PM
Attorney Cory Ross Dalmata for Barbara Dalmata and Raymond Dalmata added to case. (Didonna, Edward) |
||
utility
Add Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:48 PM
Attorney Jordan K Merson and Matthew Merson for John Doe 1 and John Doe 2 added to case. (Didonna, Edward) |
||
utility
Add Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:52 PM
Attorney Amy Christine Keller for LG 68 Doe added to case. (Didonna, Edward) |
||
utility
Add Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:54 PM
Attorney Slater Slater Schulman LLP for LG 68 Doe added to case. (Didonna, Edward) |
||
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/08 6:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by The Official Committee of Tort Claimants . (Kugler, Robert) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/08 12:47 PM
Certificate of Service (Lead Case Docket No. 251 and Adv. Pro. Case Docket No. 14) Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) |
|
18 | 18
order
Shorten Time
Thu 06/08 12:10 PM
Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time Motion to Intervene Filed by The Official Committee of Tort Claimants Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2023 at 10:30 AM at Albany CourtRoom. (Bazan, Judy) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Shorten Time
Thu 06/08 11:19 AM
Motion to Shorten Time Filed by The Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Kugler, Robert) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Intervene
Thu 06/08 11:18 AM
Motion to Intervene Filed by The Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Kugler, Robert) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/08 9:34 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Generic Motion
Thu 06/08 8:49 AM
Order Granting Motion FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO (I) USE PSEUDONYMS FOR CVA DEFENDANTS AND (II) FOR AUTHORIZATION TO SERVE PROCESS ON COUNSEL FOR CVA DEFENDANTS (Bazan, Judy) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
audio
Thu 06/08 6:00 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [06/07/2023 10:57:09 AM]. File Size [ 185 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:36 ]. (admin) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/07 4:57 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Wed 06/07 1:41 PM
Hearing Held; GRANTED, PER TERMS ON RECORD . Order due by 07/07/2023. (OConnell, Theresa) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/02 12:27 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Adversary Cover Sheet
Fri 06/02 12:25 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . (Brennan, Francis) |
|
7 | 7
order
Shorten Time
Fri 06/02 11:08 AM
Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2023 at 10:30 AM at Albany CourtRoom. (Rosenberg, Dana) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Shorten Time
Thu 06/01 3:40 PM
Motion to Shorten Time Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York. (Brennan, Francis) |
|
5 | 5
motion
ZGeneric Motion
Thu 06/01 3:38 PM
Motion MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO (I) USE PSEUDONYMS FOR CVA DEFENDANTS AND (II) FOR AUTHORIZATION TO SERVE PROCESS ON COUNSEL FOR CVA DEFENDANTS Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York. (Brennan, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 06/01 3:36 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York . Hearing scheduled for 6/28/2023 at 10:30 AM at Albany CourtRoom. (Brennan, Francis) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 06/01 3:34 PM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION UNDER §§ 105(a) and 362(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE ENJOINING THE PROSECUTION OF STATE COURT ACTIONS AGAINST NON-DEBTOR ENTITIES Filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York. (Brennan, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Thu 06/01 3:26 PM
Summons Issued on Sharon Winner Answer Due 07/3/2023; Shannon Webb Answer Due 07/3/2023; Jasmatie Tennassee Answer Due 07/3/2023; Dylan Custer Answer Due 07/3/2023; Deana Wasson Answer Due 07/3/2023; Barbara Dalmata Answer Due 07/3/2023; Raymond Dalmata Answer Due 07/3/2023; John Doe 1 Answer Due 07/3/2023; John Doe 2 Answer Due 07/3/2023; LG 68 Doe Answer Due 07/3/2023 (Brennan, Francis) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint(COURT USE ONLY)
Thu 06/01 3:26 PM
Adversary case 23-90005 1. (72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, New York against Sharon Winner, Shannon Webb, Jasmatie Tennassee, Dylan Custer, Deana Wasson, Barbara Dalmata, Raymond Dalmata, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, LG 68 Doe. Fee Amount of $350 is DEFERRED.. (Brennan, Francis) |