Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-01210

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 8:23-ap-00039
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2023
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Kastrenakes
1755 McCauley Rd.
Clearwater, FL 33764
Represented By
Michael Kastrenakes
contact info
Plaintiff
Panayiotis Vasiloudes
100 S. Ashley Drive
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
John A Anthony
Anthony & Partners, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cygram Heritage, LLLP
Anthony & Partners, LLC, 100 South Ashle 100 South Ashley Drive, Suite 1600
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
John A Anthony
Anthony & Partners, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Mon 04/28 8:11 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of Plaintiff Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes Related [+]. (Anthony, John)
Related: [-] 20
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/28 8:08 AM
Adversary Case 8:23-ap-39 Closed. (Anel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Fri 04/25 6:00 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary with Prejudice as to Discharge Proceeding . Service Instructions: John Anthony is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-]
court Reopen AP Case Fri 04/25 5:57 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/27 8:26 AM
Adversary Case 8:23-ap-39 Closed. (Lidia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
19 19 order Order Dismissing Adversary Thu 10/05 9:53 AM
DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Pdf Not Attached). Order Dismissing Adversary Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Brenton) Modified on 10/05/2023 (Brenton)
Related: [-] 17
Saturday, September 09, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sun 09/10 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 09/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #17 )
Thursday, September 07, 2023
17 17 court Notice of Proposed Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/07 1:21 PM
Notice of Proposed Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding . Objections due by 10/2/2023. (Merritt, Anel) Modified on 09/07/2023: This Notice is also entered in case 8:22-bk-01210-CED for the purpose of serving all creditors. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court Reopen AP Case Thu 09/07 1:19 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
court (NO PAPER) - Removal of Restrictions on Transcript Thu 08/24 9:23 AM
Removal of Viewing Restrictions on Transcript Due to No Request for Redaction from Hearing Participants Related [+]. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, August 17, 2023
court Compromise Cross-Reference Thu 08/17 12:56 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:22-bk-01210-CED, Doc. No.316 . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 23, 2023
court Compromise Cross-Reference Mon 07/24 10:31 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:22-bk-01210-CED Michael Kastrenakes, Doc No. 305 . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Tue 06/20 8:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
Monday, June 12, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Mon 06/12 11:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (AP) Sat 05/27 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
13 13 court Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Wed 05/24 11:13 AM
Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript to be filed within 7 calendar days of the date of service of this notice, but an additional three days may be added if the notice is served by U.S. Mail Related [+]. (Susan M.)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/23 7:58 AM
Adversary Case 8:23-ap-39 Administratively Closed. (See order doc11 )(Anel) Modified on 5/23/2023 (Anel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
12 12 court Transcript Mon 05/22 11:00 AM
Transcript Regarding Hearing Held 05-08-23 on Transcript of Matters outlined in Doc. #10. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Schultz Reporting of Pasco, Inc: 727-808-1484 . Transcript access will be restricted through 08/21/2023. (Schultz Reporting of Pasco, Inc. (GS))
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
11 11 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 05/19 3:05 PM
Omnibus Order Granting Ore Tenus Motion to Consolidate Adversary Proceedings Under Bankruptcy Code §§523 and 727 (ore tenus motion doc 64 in case 22-ap-95) . Service Instructions: John Anthony is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Martha)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 13, 2023
court Request for Audio Recording of Proceeding Sat 05/13 1:51 PM
Request for Audio Recording of Proceeding. Proceeding held: 5/8/2023. (Schultz Reporting of Pasco, Inc. (GS))
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Sat 05/13 1:56 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Request for Audio Recording of Proceeding([LINK:8:23-ap-00039-CED] ) [court,reqaudio] ( 32.00). Receipt Number A72424078, Amount Paid $ 32.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
10 10 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 05/09 3:26 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: John Anthony, Michael Katrenakes WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Pretrial Conference - Continued to 7/10/2023 at 2:30 pm - Notice or order by Anthony Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
9 9 misc Report (AP) Tue 05/02 2:59 PM
Report of Status Filed by Lynn Welter Sherman on behalf of Original Trustee Traci Stevenson. (Sherman, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 23, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Tue 04/25 10:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Tue 04/25 10:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Friday, April 21, 2023
6 6 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Fri 04/21 3:33 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/8/2023 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Tonya)
Related: [-] 4
5 5 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Fri 04/21 2:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/20 10:42 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Michael Kastrenakes. (Ellen M.)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Mailing (AP) Tue 04/04 5:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing Adversary Complaint to Michael Kastrenakes Filed by Nicholas Lafalce on behalf of Plaintiffs Cygram Heritage, LLLP, Cygram Holdings, L.P., Dr. Panayiotis Vasiloudes Related [+]. (Lafalce, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, March 31, 2023
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/31 12:31 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/01/2023. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Thu 03/30 10:57 AM
Complaint by Panayiotis Vasiloudes, Cygram Heritage, LLLP against Michael Kastrenakes. (Verify Fee) Nature of Suit: [41 (Objection / Revocation of Discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))]. (Anthony, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. G
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. H
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. I