HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-02915 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:1300 F.E.L.A. (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 6:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Silver Birch GP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HDI Global Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Chidori Ship Holding LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Jessica Ship Holding S.A.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
M/V One Apus in rem
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ocean Network Express PTE LTD.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Silver Birch GP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
60 | 60
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 06/28 6:01 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (622 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A.. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 9/6/2024., Motions due by 9/6/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/28/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (tg) |