Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:23-cv-00422
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2023
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Case in other court:Delaware CCP for New Castle County, CPU4-23-000464
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2023 6:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Ines Hungria
Defendant
State Division of Human & Civil Rights
Plaintiff
James Jeffrey Hepler
954 Janvier Court
Middletown, DE 19709


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Monday, October 23, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/24 7:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - see order for full details (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/23/2023. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
17 17 appeal USCA Order Terminating Appeal Mon 10/02 4:23 PM
USCA Order Terminating Appeal as to15 for failure to pay docketing fees Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by James Jeffrey Hepler. USCA Decision: Dismissed. (cw,)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
16 16 appeal - - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit Thu 09/14 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re15 Notice of Appeal filed by James Jeffrey Hepler. USCA Case Number 23-2694 USCA Case Manager: Carmella (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (dw2, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
15 15 appeal - NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit Wed 09/13 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Third Circuit of14 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Appeal filed by James Jeffrey Hepler. (No IFP, No Fee Paid)(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 09/05 10:40 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (D.I.8 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall either pay $402.00 filing fee or file a renewed motion for leave to proceed without prepaying fees or costs (AO 239). Failure to timely pay the filing fee or file a renewed motion to proceed without prepaying will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/5/2023. (apk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
13 13 misc Letter Thu 08/17 2:25 PM
Letter to Judge Williams, from J. Jeffrey Hepler, regarding D.I.8 MOTION for Reconsideration and including change of address. (jfm)
Related: [-]
utility Address updated Thu 08/17 4:28 PM
Address updated per D.I.13 Letter (jfm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
12 12 misc Letter Wed 06/28 3:55 PM
Letter to Judge Williams, from J. Jeffrey Hepler, regarding D.I.8 MOTION for Reconsideration. (vfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, May 15, 2023
11 11 misc Letter Mon 05/15 3:49 PM
Letter to James Jeffrey Hepler, from Clerk of Court, regarding questions of States Sovereign Immunity - regarding D.I.10 Letter. (apk)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Mon 05/15 3:46 PM
Letter to Judge Williams, from J. Jeffrey Hepler, regarding D.I.8 and questions about States Sovereign Immunity. - re8 MOTION for Reconsideration(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, May 05, 2023
9 9 misc Letter Fri 05/05 9:11 AM
Letter to James Jeffrey Hepler, from Clerk of Court, regarding questions of States Sovereign Immunity - re8 MOTION for Reconsideration re6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (smg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
8 8 motion Reconsideration Fri 05/05 8:57 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Questions regarding States Sovereign Immunity - filed by James Jeffrey Hepler. (smg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Tue 05/02 9:17 AM
Letter with Exhibit to Judge Williams from James Jeffrey Helper in support of D.I.1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, April 27, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/27 2:03 PM
ORDER Denying D.I.1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/27/2023. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
5 5 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 04/27 8:53 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/26 11:32 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
4 4 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 04/18 2:40 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Exhibit to a Document Tue 04/18 1:59 PM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT 4 in support of D.I.2 Notice of Removal, by James Jeffrey Hepler. (smg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/18 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Common Please for the State of Delaware in and for New Castle County, Case Number CPU4-23-000464 - filed by James Jeffrey Hepler.(smg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-3, 5-10,
Att: 2 Acknowledgement of Consent Form,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/18 1:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by James Jeffrey Hepler. (smg)
Related: [-]