Original Case: 1:23-cv-00422

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02694
Typecivil / private / civil rights-prisoner
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Oct 02, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 04, 2023 5:18 PM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
INES HUNGRIA
Defendant - Appellee
STATE DIVISION OF HUMAN & CIVIL RIGHTS
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES JEFFREY HEPLER
Represented By
James Jeffrey Hepler
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/04/2023 5:18 PM EDT
Thursday, September 14, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant James Jeffrey Hepler in District Court No. 1-23-cv-00422. (DW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order_042723
Att: 3 1 pgs District_Court_Order_090523
Att: 4 1 pgs Case_Caption
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (DW)
Related: [-]