Villecco v. Barela, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-02403
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01132 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 23, 2023 2:28 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH M. BARELA
|
Represented By
Jame Christopher Kalish Boeckx
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado contact info |
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP E. SPESSHARDT
|
Represented By
Jame Christopher Kalish Boeckx
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado contact info |
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 19 2023
[11000592] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [23-1132] |
Docket last updated: 05/23/2023 2:28 AM MDT |
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
[10994160] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/25/2023. Notice of appearance due on 05/09/2023 for Joseph M. Barela and Philip E. Spesshardt and on 05/25/2023 for Michael Villecco. 23-1132 | ||
Att: 1 14 pgs Transmittal letter and preliminary record | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se |