Villecco v. Barela et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel D Domenico |
Referred: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-02403 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 15, 2023 2:45 AM MDT |
Defendant
Joseph M. Barela
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philip E. Spesshardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Villecco
General Delivery
Durango, CO 81301 |
GPO
Apr 19 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 19 April 2023. The Plaintiff's Motion to Perpetuate Evidence Pending Appeal 72 is DENIED.(cmadr, ) |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
172 | 172
motion
Leave
Mon 09/09 8:23 AM
Petition for Leave to File Motion by Plaintiff Michael Villecco. (cmadr, ) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
171 | 171
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 09/05 2:06 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to164 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Villecco : (USCA Case No. 24-1320 (cmadr, ) |
|
170 | 170
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 09/05 2:05 PM
ORDER of USCA as to164 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Villecco. (USCA Case No. 24-1320 . This appeal is dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to Tenth Circuit Rule 42.1. (cmadr, ) |