Peanuts Worldwide LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca R Pallmeyer |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-02965 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 5:22 AM CST |
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
|
|
Defendant
A13OMHVJLL1X8B
|
|
Defendant
A13T0TYBK2XTJK
|
|
Defendant
A3ASBOPFT71WGM
|
|
Defendant
A3H2VRMAN978L8
|
|
Defendant
AJDLMR90OUTD1
|
|
Defendant
AMUTUR US
|
|
Defendant
ANYONGBO
|
|
Defendant
An Attitude Store
|
|
Defendant
Beautiful World Toy Store
|
|
Defendant
CHuang'T'ou
|
|
Defendant
CJIANQQ1818
|
|
Defendant
Cartoon Backpack Store
|
|
Defendant
Castle Store
|
|
Defendant
Chengshikekaoxiaolanjun
|
|
Defendant
Ckaodiog
|
|
Defendant
DISNEY OFFlCAL Store
|
|
Defendant
Electrician Guy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FLASNAKE
|
|
Defendant
Gendigu
|
|
Defendant
GuozxSHOP
|
|
Defendant
HGHZZ8978
|
|
Defendant
HaiMai Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Headings51
|
|
Defendant
Huamei Jewelry World
|
|
Defendant
Juxiantange
|
|
Defendant
KIRIN-7 DAYS-15DAYS DELIVERY
|
|
Defendant
KTDBD
|
|
Defendant
Kawa e-Store
|
|
Defendant
LRGY Store
|
|
Defendant
LiPeng ShiJiuJie
|
|
Defendant
Lxhdy
|
|
Defendant
My Goal - Football
|
|
Defendant
Nice To Meet You Plush Store
|
|
Defendant
PbLoveHome
|
|
Defendant
Pretty Girls biubiubiu Store
|
|
Defendant
Rfvbnsx
|
|
Defendant
Riccu1000 Store
|
|
Defendant
SSHIZ
|
|
Defendant
SUOSAN
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Xin Rui Si Chuang Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shop1100390497 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102235066 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102269198 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102298440 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102680442 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102683332 Store
|
|
Defendant
Spencer Colleen
|
|
Defendant
TREUTRIWRHW
|
|
Defendant
TangKun
|
|
Defendant
TongLing Metal Tin Store
|
|
Defendant
VGDH456FGH
|
|
Defendant
W-AKL Store
|
|
Defendant
WEIJIAJCAI
|
|
Defendant
WIRJN25
|
|
Defendant
Wholesale Small items Store
|
|
Defendant
WwSsYy2319
|
|
Defendant
XINFUZHIJIA
|
|
Defendant
XUNJINGWANGLUO
|
|
Defendant
XiaMenShiHuLiQuYiHuaZhiMingHuaHuiDian
|
|
Defendant
Yiyongxiang
|
|
Defendant
You yi
|
|
Defendant
Yunxiaoxiancuifeibaihuodian
|
|
Defendant
ZBINM
|
|
Defendant
ZHANG ERPENG
|
|
Defendant
Zhou XJ
|
|
Defendant
carpet_plus
|
|
Defendant
chentongslakxiecjer
|
|
Defendant
chulinzhen223
|
|
Defendant
daerzichichi
|
|
Defendant
dongzi2
|
|
Defendant
e4uuzd
|
|
Defendant
favorandy
|
|
Defendant
feizhongzhishang
|
|
Defendant
fusyida
|
|
Defendant
gongguipingijyu
|
|
Defendant
guodandan2b
|
|
Defendant
hfove_76
|
|
Defendant
huanglongkun
|
|
Defendant
huangshufang123123
|
|
Defendant
huanlanshanghang
|
|
Defendant
jiaaixuan-shop
|
|
Defendant
kozzcbhhh
|
|
Defendant
lanshanquxuanboshipinjinxiaobu
|
|
Defendant
lubowitzwilber
|
|
Defendant
luoxiaolong19950408
|
|
Defendant
mi du mao yi
|
|
Defendant
mound island
|
|
Defendant
multi-goldtechnolog0
|
|
Defendant
pian-1329
|
|
Defendant
qingshengshishi
|
|
Defendant
qqkdedianoo
|
|
Defendant
renhong66058
|
|
Defendant
shanghaimengqiwangluokejiyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
shenzhenfeisipucoltd
|
|
Defendant
tianshengxiandedian
|
|
Defendant
traceabilitymedicalbea-0
|
|
Defendant
tsGAcn
|
|
Defendant
vfdsjsabfasf
|
|
Defendant
wangqia
|
|
Defendant
wangshilongdedian
|
|
Defendant
watre
|
|
Defendant
woroom101
|
|
Defendant
wuwenhongbaihuo
|
|
Defendant
xiaotong-shop
|
|
Defendant
xiaoyaojing5566
|
|
Defendant
xingdongpai
|
|
Defendant
xushaok
|
|
Defendant
yanyanw
|
|
Defendant
yidian-shop
|
|
Defendant
yjudkcjkfyli
|
|
Defendant
yuanjiesm
|
|
Defendant
yuhuiming7333
|
|
Defendant
yujiangqushaofanbaihuoshanghang
|
|
Defendant
yunchengshiyunchengjingjijishukaifaqucuilangongyi
|
|
Defendant
yunhengshanghang
|
|
Defendant
yunxiaoxianshuoroubaihuodian
|
|
Defendant
zengjian999
|
|
Defendant
zhaozhiwenfang
|
|
Defendant
zhijiangshinatingshangmaoyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
zinuocat
|
|
Defendant
zumL
|
|
Plaintiff
Peanuts Worldwide LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Bo Yuan Chuang
Terminated: 06/09/2023
|
|
Defendant
LJWYKF
Terminated: 06/09/2023
|
|
Defendant
LuckFlower Shop
Terminated: 06/09/2023
|
|
Defendant
One Click Co., Ltd
Terminated: 06/09/2023
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 2:17 AM CDT |
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) | ||
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, ) | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by Peanuts Worldwide LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20628581.(Gaudio, Justin) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
2 | 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC Schedule A regarding complaint1 (Gaudio, Justin) | |
3 | 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) | |
4 | 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) | |
5 | 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Peanuts Worldwide LLC (Gaudio, Justin) | |
6 | 6 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Peanuts Worldwide LLC (Gaudio, Justin) | |
7 | 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) | |
8 | 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) | |
9 | 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Marcella Deshonda Slay (Slay, Marcella) | |
10 | 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Trevor Christian Talhami (Talhami, Trevor) |