Peanuts Worldwide LLC v. Electrician Guy
Original Case: 1:23-cv-02965
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02170 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 4:50 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
ELECTRICIAN GUY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PEANUTS WORLDWIDE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/29/2024 4:48 AM CDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/23/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/19/2024 for Electrician Guy. [1] [7392421] 24-2170 (PS) [Entered: 07/09/2024 02:04 PM] | |
Att: 1 56 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |