Craige Kevin Howlett
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Shad Robinson |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10370 |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 13, 2023 |
Discharged: | Sep 08, 2023 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Sep 05, 2023 |
Debtor
Craige Kevin Howlett
19220 Ventana Ct
Pflugerville, TX 78660-5023 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801 |
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 23-10370 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A23691300 (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Craige Kevin Howlett. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/6/2023 (Walker, Frederick) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling-First Debtor filed by Frederick E. Walker for Debtor Craige Kevin Howlett. (Walker, Frederick) | |
3 | 3 Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Lowe, John Patrick added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/6/2023 at 11:00 AM at Via Phone: (888)405-5981; Code: 2733682#. ; Objections to Discharge/Dischargeability due by 9/5/2023 (Walker, Frederick) | |
4 | 4 Declaration for Electronic Filing filed by Frederick E. Walker for Debtor Craige Kevin Howlett. (Walker, Frederick) |