Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures v. Howlett
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10370
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10370
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Shad Robinson |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01015 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Craige Kevin Howlett
19220 Ventana Court
Pflugerville, TX 78660 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures
3131 McKinney Ave., Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75204 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 1:11 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
AP-Dismiss Case (PDF)
Wed 09/11 11:19 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Case (Order entered on 9/11/2024) (Schoener, Lauren) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/11 11:21 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Schoener, Lauren) |
||
court
Hearing Held (Adversary)
Wed 09/11 2:11 PM
Hearing Held: APPROVED. (Schoener, Lauren) |
||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Tue 09/10 2:00 PM
Notice of Revised Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal filed by Jason M. Rudd for Plaintiff Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures (Rudd, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Continued (NO FORM) (Adversary)
Thu 07/11 8:46 AM
Hearing CONTINUED FROM 7/10/24 TO 9/11/24 Hearing Scheduled For 9/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 ...RESET IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY THE COURT... (Lopez, Jennifer) |
||
court
Hearing Held (Adversary)
Thu 07/11 12:26 PM
Hearing Held: CONTINUED TO 9/11/24 at 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM (Schoener, Lauren) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
court
Notice Regarding Telephonic/Webex Request
Tue 07/09 7:14 AM
Judge's Notice of Party Permitted to Appear via Telephone/Webex |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
court
Notice Regarding Telephonic/Webex Request
Mon 07/08 3:27 PM
Judge's Notice of Party Permitted to Appear via Telephone/Webex |
||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Fri 07/05 9:53 AM
Plaintiff's Witness and Exhibit List filed by Jason M. Rudd for Plaintiff Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures (Rudd, Jason) |
|
misc
Request for Telephonic or Webex/Zoom Appearance
Fri 07/05 3:21 PM
Request for Webex/Zoom Appearance(Who: Fred E. Walker, Reason: Fred Walker will be out of town on personal business on the day of the hearing and connot attend in person, Phone: 512-330-9977) (Date and Time of Hearing: July 10, 2024, at 10:00 AM) filed by Frederick E. Walker for Defendant Craige Kevin Howlett (Walker, Frederick) |
||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
misc
Request for Telephonic or Webex/Zoom Appearance
Wed 07/03 12:29 PM
Request for Webex/Zoom Appearance(Who: Jason M. Rudd, Reason: Distance to courthouse is 213 miles, Phone: 2147404038) (Date and Time of Hearing: July 10, 2024 at 10 am) filed by Jason M. Rudd for Plaintiff Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures (Rudd, Jason) |
||
Saturday, June 15, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/15 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/15/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
court
Hearing (F) (Adversary)
Thu 06/13 8:17 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Hearing Scheduled For 7/10/2024 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 ... Five calendar days before the hearing, exhibits must be: (1) mailed to U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Attn: Jennifer Lopez, Homer Thornberry Judicial Bldg., 903 San Jacinto, Suite 322, Austin, TX 78701 and (2) emailed to Jacob King at Jacob_King@txwb.uscourts.gov AND Jennifer Lopez at jennifer_lopez@txwb.uscourts.gov....You must also email Jennifer Lopez and Jacob King and request a special setting if your time estimate for both sides exceeds 30 minutes. (Lopez, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss Case (Adversary)
Thu 06/06 11:00 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Jason M. Rudd for Plaintiff Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures. (Rudd, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
cmp
Adversary Summons Served
Thu 05/16 9:33 AM
Summons Served on Craige Kevin Howlett - served on 4/9/2024 (Rudd, Jason) |
|
Saturday, May 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/11 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 05/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
AP-Obtain Summons Service (F)
Thu 05/09 11:23 AM
Order to Obtain Summons Service on Craige Kevin Howlett (Order entered on 5/9/2024) (Schoener, Lauren) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Fri 04/26 4:14 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Frederick E. Walker for Defendant Craige Kevin Howlett (Walker, Frederick) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/24 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf)
Mon 04/22 8:19 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 4/22/2024) (Schoener, Lauren) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
8
pgs
ans
Response (Adversary)
Fri 04/19 10:02 AM
Response Filed by Frederick E. Walker for Defendant Craige Kevin Howlett. (Walker, Frederick) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Fri 04/05 4:32 PM
Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jason M. Rudd for Plaintiff Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures (Rudd, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Fri 04/05 4:31 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Jason M. Rudd for Plaintiff Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures (Rudd, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
court
Summons Issued (Auto)
Fri 04/05 4:22 PM
Summons Issued on Craige Kevin Howlett Answer Due 05/6/2024 (Rudd, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 4:22 PM
Adversary case 24-01015 Complaint filed by Foundation for Anime and Niche Subcultures (attorney Jason M. Rudd) against Craige Kevin Howlett (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Rudd, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet |