California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:23-bk-14154
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2023
Plan Confirmed:May 09, 2024

Debtor
Ittella International LLC
6305 Alondra Blvd
Paramount, CA 90723
Represented By
David L. Neale
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
1242 1242 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/21 4:22 PM
Certificate of Service (Supplemental) re: Amended Notice of Hearing; Notice of Post-Confirmation Status Conference (Docket No. 1226) Filed by Other Professional Stretto Related [+]. (Vandell, Travis)
Related: [-] 1226 Notice of Hearing ; Notice of Post-Confirmation Status Conference Filed by Liquidator Peter Hurwitz.
Friday, April 18, 2025
1241 1241 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 04/18 2:27 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. The Filer Is Instructed To Re-File The Document Using The Correct Docket Event. 'Withdrawal of Claim'. Related [+] (LG)
Related: [-] 1240 Withdrawal re: filed by Other Professional Stretto
1240 1240 misc Withdrawal re: Fri 04/18 11:17 AM
Withdrawal re: Claim No. 287 for U.S. Customs and Border Protection Filed by Other Professional Stretto. (Vandell, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1239 1239 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 04/17 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1238 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1238 1238 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 04/15 5:55 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By And Between Bernalillo County, NM And Liquidating Trustee, Pertaining To Property Located At 3041 University Blvd. SE, Albuquerque, NM 87106, (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/15/2025 (LG)
Related: [-] 1237
Monday, April 14, 2025
1237 1237 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 04/14 6:46 PM
Stipulation By Peter Hurwitz and Bernalillo County, NM, Pertaining to Property Located at 3041 University Blvd. SE, Albuquerque, NM 87106 Filed by Liquidator Peter Hurwitz (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]