Member Case
Lead case is: 2:23-bk-14154

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:23-bk-14157
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
My Jojo Inc
6305 Alondra Blvd
Paramount, CA 90723
Represented By
David L. Neale
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
23 23 court Case Reassigned - Admin Order Reassigning Judge Only (batch) Mon 03/03 1:07 PM
In accordance with the Administrative Order 25-03 dated 02 04-2025 this case is hereby reassigned from Judge Sandra R. Klein to Judge Julia W. Brand. (LL2)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
22 22 38 pgs misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 07/28 5:36 PM
List of Equity Security Holders , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc Related [+]. (Neale, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Friday, July 07, 2023
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/07 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/07 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 07/05 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 ORDER for joint administration (BNC-PDF)
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 07/05 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
17 17 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Wed 07/05 8:03 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - Incorrect event code: CORRECT EVENT CODE: Bankruptcy Events BK - Notices >Notice THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (TM)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of motion/application filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc
Tuesday, July 04, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 07/04 11:10 AM
Notice of motion/application -[Notice Of Joint Administration Of Cases And Requirements For Filing Documents]- Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc Related [+]. (Neale, David)
Related: [-] 3 Ex parte application Debtor's Ex Parte Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases; Declaration Of Edward Bidanset In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc
Monday, July 03, 2023
15 15 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Mon 07/03 4:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/31/2023 at 08:30 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 9/29/2023. (LL2)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Mon 07/03 2:13 PM
ORDER for joint administration of cases (BNC-PDF) Signed on 7/3/2023. (TM)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 07/03 9:36 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document (Proof of Service) filed without electronic /s/ and/or holographic signature. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. Related [+] (TM)
Related: [-] 4 Statement filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc
Sunday, July 02, 2023
12 12 motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 07/02 11:15 PM
Emergency motion [utility] Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 07/02 11:13 PM
Emergency motion [Shares Trading] Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 07/02 11:12 PM
Emergency motion [Payroll] Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Declaration Sun 07/02 11:10 PM
Declaration re: Omnibus Declaration Of Edward Bidanset In Suppport Of Emergency First Day Motions Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc. (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 07/02 11:09 PM
Emergency motion [cash collateral] Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 07/02 11:08 PM
Emergency motion [cash management] Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 9 pgs motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 07/02 11:06 PM
Emergency motion [employ] Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Smith, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 07/02 10:24 PM
Emergency motion Debtors Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Honor Pre-Petition Obligations To Critical Vendors And To Provide Adequate Protection For Warehouse And Carrier Liens; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement Sun 07/02 10:00 PM
Statement Statement Regarding Cash Collateral Or Debtor In Possession Financing [FRBP 4001; LBR 4001-2] Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc. (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Ex parte application (motion) Sun 07/02 9:34 PM
Ex parte application Debtor's Ex Parte Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases; Declaration Of Edward Bidanset In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 07/02 9:10 PM
Emergency motion -[Debtors Emergency Motion For Order Limiting Notice And Related Relief]- Filed by Debtor My Jojo Inc (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 07/02 6:27 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by My Jojo Inc List of Equity Security Holders due 07/17/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 07/17/2023. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 07/17/2023. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 07/17/2023. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 07/17/2023. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 07/17/2023. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 07/17/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 07/17/2023. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 07/17/2023. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 07/17/2023. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 07/17/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 07/17/2023. (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sun 07/02 8:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:23-bk-14157] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A55641757. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1