David Crum v. Walden Commons Corporate Office
Original Case: 1:22-cv-01333
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv.pr-01761 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 21, 2023 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
WALDEN COMMONS CORPORATE OFFICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID HALL CRUM
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/21/2023 4:20 AM EDT |
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-01333-LMB-IDD. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001405720] 23-1761 EB [Entered: 07/20/2023 12:42 PM] | |
2 | 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: David Hall Crum;Gwynne Lynn Booth. [1001405745] Informal Opening Brief due 08/14/2023. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 23-1761 EB [Entered: 07/20/2023 12:54 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001405750]. Due: 08/03/2023. 23-1761 EB [Entered: 07/20/2023 12:56 PM] |