Villecco v. Barela, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-02403
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01260 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 27, 2023 8:52 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH M. BARELA
|
Represented By
Jame Christopher Kalish Boeckx
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado contact info |
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP E. SPESSHARDT
|
Represented By
Jame Christopher Kalish Boeckx
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado contact info |
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 26 2023
[11039460] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action. Clerk of the Court. [23-1260] |
Docket last updated: 10/27/2023 8:52 AM MDT |
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
[11022583] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/18/2023. Notice of appearance due on 09/05/2023 for Joseph M. Barela and Philip E. Spesshardt. Notice of appearance due on 09/21/2023 for Michael Villecco. 23-1260 | ||
Att: 1 59 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se | ||
2 pgs [11022725] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal due 09/12/2023. Appellantt's brief due on 10/02/2023 for Michael Villecco. 23-1260 | ||
[11022751] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 4 - pleadings. 23-1260 | ||
Att: 1 150 pgs Volume 1 - pleadings | ||
Att: 2 68 pgs Volume 2 - pleadings | ||
Att: 3 49 pgs Volume 3 - pleadings | ||
Att: 4 21 pgs Volume 4 - pleadings |