Hackford v. United States of America
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Jared C Bennett |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00618 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2024 2:01 AM MST |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Richita Marie Hackford
820 E 300 N 113-10
ROOSEVELT, UT 84066 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 07/23 10:45 AM
USCA Case Number Case Appealed to Tenth Circuit Case Number 24-4078 for10 Notice of Appeal filed by Richita Marie Hackford. (jrj) |
|
11 | 11
appeal
Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA
Tue 07/23 9:56 AM
Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re10 Notice of Appeal.(alf) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/23 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to8 Memorandum Decision,9 Judgment filed by Richita Marie Hackford. Appeals to the USCA for the 10th Circuit. Fee Status: Not paid. Filing fee $ 605.(alf) |
|
Att: 1 Letter from 10th Circuit | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Fri 06/28 2:28 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Case Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/28/2024. (alf) |
|
8 | 8
13
pgs
order
Memorandum Decision
Fri 06/28 2:24 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Action is dismissed without prejudice - this court lacks jurisdiction over this action and Ms. Hackford has failed to state a plausible claim for relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/28/2024. (alf) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Lodged Document
Wed 04/10 8:42 AM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of "Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling". Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court.(alf) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Thu 09/14 4:33 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Richita Marie Hackford. (mh) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint (Court)
Fri 09/08 8:46 AM
COMPLAINT against United States of America (Originally received by the court on 09/06/2023). (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Richita Marie Hackford. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (haa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Statement Mart, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 09/08 8:42 AM
ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will screen this action under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and DUCivR3-2(b). The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court. If this action is allowed to proceed, the court will order service of process on Defendant(s). Plaintiff must not file any motions or other documents during the time this action is screened or until the court orders otherwise. However, Plaintiff may file court forms (e.g., the email filing and electronic notification form for unrepresented parties and the consent to jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge form). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 09/07/2023. (haa) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment
Thu 09/07 10:02 AM
NOTICE TO THE PLAINTIFF - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Richita Marie Hackford. Form due by 9/28/2023. (mh) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Lodged Document
Thu 09/07 8:32 AM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, exhibit and envelope.. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court.(haa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 09/07 8:27 AM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. filed by Plaintiff Richita Marie Hackford.(haa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 IFP Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 SS Suplemental Income |