Hackford v. United States
Original Case: 2:23-cv-00618
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-04078 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 4:36 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RICHITA MARIE HACKFORD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/28/2024 4:36 AM MDT |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
[11106706] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/23/2024 Notice of appearance due on 08/22/2024 for Richita Marie Hackford 24-4078 | ||
Att: 1 39 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas |