USA v. Maldonado-Arce
Alabama Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 5:23-cr-00298 |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 28, 2023 8:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rodrigo Maldonado-Arce (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/18/2024 7:06 AM CDT |
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 INDICTMENT as to dft Rodrigo Maldonado-Arce (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-5, 6, 7. Please file all subsequent documents using the criminal case number assigned to this indictment. (KBB) | |
Att: 1 (SEALED) Signed Indictment | ||
2 | 2 MOTION to Seal Indictment filed by USA as to dft Rodrigo Maldonado-Arce. (KBB) | |
3 | 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Indictment as to dft Rodrigo Maldonado-Arce (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/29/2023. (KBB) |