USA v. Rodrigo Maldonado-Arce
Original Case: 5:23-cr-00298
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-crim-12306 |
Type | criminal / direct criminal |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 18, 2024 8:06 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
RODRIGO MALDONADO-ARCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/18/2024 8:06 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Rodrigo Maldonado-Arce on 07/16/2024. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. USDC motion pending: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF APPELLATE COUNSEL filed on 07/16/2024. | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs CRIM 1 - Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Criminal Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 3 7 pgs USDC Judgement # 27 | ||
2 pgs CJA appointment issued by this court to Attorney Jerry Sanford Barclay, Jr. for Appellant Rodrigo Maldonado-Arce. | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Billingsley for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama for USA. Related cases? No. 24-12306 (ECF: Michael Billingsley) |