Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott M Grossman
Case #: 0:23-bk-18515
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Claims Deadline:Dec 27, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC
219 NE 3rd St
Hallandale Beach, FL 33009-3402
Represented By
Adam B. Leichtling
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


1. Robert Siegmann's Icebox Cafe Files for Bankruptcy (therealdeal.com)
Submitted Tue 10/31/2023
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Thursday, June 20, 2024
300 300 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 06/20 5:15 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2024 for Member Case Number 23-18530 Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
299 299 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 06/20 5:13 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2024 for Member Case Number 23-18529 Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
298 298 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 06/20 5:12 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2024 for Member Case Number 23-18526 Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
297 297 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 06/20 5:11 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2024 for Member Case Number 23-18525 Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
296 296 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 06/20 5:09 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2024 for Member Case Number 23-18523 Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
295 295 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 06/20 5:07 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2024 for Member Case Number 23-18522 Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
294 294 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 06/20 5:06 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2024 for Member Case Number 23-18521 Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
293 293 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 06/20 5:04 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
292 292 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Thu 06/20 7:59 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect or Incomplete PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE OR FILE AN AMENDED DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] 289 Amended Schedules Filed: [Schedule A/B,] Filed by Interested Party Icebox Cafe at MIA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Local Form 4)
291 291 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Thu 06/20 7:26 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 01:30 PM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Gomez, Edy)
Related: [-] 283 Application to Employ Garrett Langford as Appraiser [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
290 290 misc Declaration Wed 06/19 4:15 PM
Declaration of Robert Siegmann Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC Related [+]. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-] 270 Application to Employ Pennant Financial Corp. as Credit broker [Affidavit Attached] filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC
289 289 misc Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements Wed 06/19 4:06 PM
Amended Schedules Filed: [Schedule A/B,] Filed by Interested Party Icebox Cafe at MIA, LLC. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Form 4
Monday, June 17, 2024
288 288 order Use Cash Collateral Order Mon 06/17 9:45 AM
Fifth Interim Order Granting Motion to Authorize Debtors' Continued Use of Cash Collateral and Continuing Hearing to August 28,2024 at 1:30 p.m. at the United States Bankruptcy Courthouse, 299 E. Broward Blvd., Courtroom 308, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 Related [+] (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-] # 24
287 287 order Approve Order Mon 06/17 8:30 AM
Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into Factoring Arrangement with Versant Funding LLC and (I) to Sell Certain Accounts Receivable Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 363(B) and (F), (II) to Grant Versant Funding LLC Security Interests and Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 364(C) and (D), and (III) to Schedule a Final Hearing on the Matter. Related [+] (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-] # 277
Thursday, June 13, 2024
286 286 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/13 1:56 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC Related [+]. (Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-] 238 Motion to Reject Executory Contract filed by Debtor Fig & Fennel at MIA, LLC,285 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued