Member Case
Lead case is: 0:23-bk-18515

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott M Grossman
Case #: 0:23-bk-18525
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Claims Deadline:Dec 27, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Icebox Pantry, LLC
219 NE 3rd St
Hallandale Beach, FL 33009-3402
Represented By
Adam B. Leichtling
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Thursday, October 26, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 10/27 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 11/21/2023 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 1/22/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 12/27/2023. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
9 9 court Meeting of Creditors 11 Tue 10/24 10:39 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 11/21/2023 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 1/22/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 12/27/2023. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Request for Notice Tue 10/24 5:47 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (AIS Portfolio Services LP (Sharma))
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
7 7 order Joint Administration Order Mon 10/23 11:10 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 0:23-bk-18515 with Member Case 0:2023-bk-18525-SMG Related [+] (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] # 3
6 6 court Case Reassigned [Judge] Mon 10/23 11:02 AM
Judge Scott M Grossman added to case. Involvement of Judge Peter D. Russin Terminated (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 21, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/22 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Thursday, October 19, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Thu 10/19 10:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Martin P Ochs Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Ochs, Martin)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Joint Administration Thu 10/19 7:42 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 23-18521 23-18522 23-18523 23-18525 23-18526 23-18529 23-18530 into Lead Case 23-18515 Filed by Debtor Icebox Pantry, LLC (Leichtling, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 1 pgs order Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business Thu 10/19 1:34 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
1 1 45 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Wed 10/18 1:14 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 12/27/2023. (Leichtling, Adam)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 10/18 1:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-18525 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43232513. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]