Stark v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick R Wyrick |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00967 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2024 4:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Stark
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Transcript Letter
Wed 07/31 10:50 AM
TRANSCRIPT LETTER advising no transcripts are necessary re16 Notice of Appeal filed by Nancy Stark. The record is ready for appeal purposes. (dtb) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
Transcript Order Form
Mon 07/29 11:18 AM
TRANSCRIPT Order Form by Nancy Stark re16 Notice of Appeal that transcripts are not necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. (Mullins, Glen) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Appeal Fee
Mon 07/15 2:03 PM
USCA Appeal Fee received in the amount of $ 605, receipt number 500007737, re16 Notice of Appeal filed by Nancy Stark. Receipt emailed to payer. (rp) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 07/15 9:18 AM
Tenth Circuit USCA Case Number 24-6137 for16 Notice of Appeal filed by Nancy Stark. Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/15/2024. Fee, Docketing statement, Transcript order form and Notice of appearance due 07/29/2024 for Nancy Stark. Disclosure statement and Notice of appearance due on 07/29/2024 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. 24-6137 (naa) |
|
17 | 17
appeal
Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit
Mon 07/15 8:14 AM
PRELIMINARY RECORD LETTER - Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal with Preliminary Record sent to Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals re16 Notice of Appeal(naa) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Preliminary Record on Appeal | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 07/12 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Judgment,14 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Nancy Stark. (Mullins, Glen) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Fri 06/14 1:33 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 6/14/2024. (ks) |
|
14 | 14
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 06/14 1:31 PM
ORDER granting9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support and dismissing case with prejudice (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 6/14/2024. (ks) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 01/26 5:57 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Stewart, Leasa) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 01/19 7:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support filed by Nancy Stark.(Mullins, Glen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-McKenzie 10.31.22 letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Baker McKenzie 11.29.22 letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Finley Claim File Documents (Redacted), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Dr. Linck 3-30-22 report (Redacted), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-RSL 11.04.22 letter (Redacted), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-Durbin 11.18.22 letter, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-Durbin requests for Dr. Linck Records (Redacted), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8-RSL 12.01.22 letter, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9-Durbin 12.15.22 letter, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10-Provident 08.16.22 letter | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 01/04 2:24 PM
ORDER granting10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 1/4/2024. (ks) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 01/03 1:36 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Nancy Stark. (Mullins, Glen) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Fri 12/15 1:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Stewart, Leasa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Policy | ||
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to
Fri 12/08 4:23 PM
ORDER granting7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 12/8/2023. (ks) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Leave
Wed 12/06 1:44 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Stewart, Leasa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Entry of Appearance
Wed 12/06 1:39 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Leasa M Stewart on behalf of Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/14 3:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Stark. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 11/1/2023.(Mullins, Glen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service from OID | ||
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Thu 10/26 12:51 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Gerald E Durbin, II on behalf of Nancy Stark (Durbin, Gerald) Modified on 10/26/2023 to correct document (naa) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Wed 10/25 11:58 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Glen Mullins on behalf of Nancy Stark (Mullins, Glen) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/25 9:52 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (kb) |
|
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Wed 10/25 11:34 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4279855. (Mullins, Glen) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/25 9:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Nancy Stark.(kb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Reliance LTD Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Finley Claim File 0668 - Job Description, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Lf Provident Funding Payroll Manager dtd 08.16.22, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - RSL Occupational Description Finley Claim File 794-795, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - OHH Progress Notes Finley Claim File 669-674, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - OHH 06.06.07 Progress Note Finley Claim File 541-542, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Affidavit of Nancy Stark, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Affidavit of Tom Stark, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Order to Withdraw Life Sustaining Treatment, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Employers Statement Finley Claim File 376-385, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - RSL recommends file for SSD, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - June 18, 2008 RSL letter Finley Claim File 2112-2113, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Feb. 20, 2008 RSL letter Finley Claim File 2021-2124, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Claim Note re SSD Finley Claim File 285, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Finley Claim File 11,285,297,333, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Finley Claim File 2125-2127, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Certification of Financial Difficulty, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Finley Claim File 2732-2734, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Finley Claim File 1011, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - 2009 Notice of Decision-Fully Favorable, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - RSL 03.22.2010 letter, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - Dr. Sturgis Discharge Summary 05.05.09, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - Bouvette stating Jill permanently disabled, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - Dr. Tyndall recd unable to maintain gainful employment, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - Claim Notes medical & rehabilitation reviews-reduced, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - Nov. 17, 2020 RSL letter new claims examiner, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - Skopenow Intelligence Report, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Psybar Examination, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - RSL Apr. 14, 2022 RSL letter terminating benefits, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - Oct. 7, 2022 Finley Appeal, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - Dr. Tyndall letter dated 09.06.22, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 32 - Dr. Bouvette Dec. 23, 2022 letter Redacted, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 33 - Lon Huff Jan. 9, 2023 Report, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 34 - RSL Jan. 23, 2023 letter, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 35 - Email requesting RSL pay atty fees, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 36 - RSL email refusing to pay atty fees & costs, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 37 - April 10, 2023 financial hardship request, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit 38 - RSL June 26, 2023 letter, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit 39 - RSL Aug. 7, 2023 letter, | ||
Att: 40 Civil Cover Sheet |