Stark v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Original Case: 5:23-cv-00967
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-06137 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 17, 2024 2:43 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NANCY STARK, as Legal Guardian and Mother of Jill Finley, an incapacitated person
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/17/2024 2:43 AM MDT |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
[11104652] Entry of appearance submitted by Joshua Bachrach for Appellee Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/15/2024. Manner of Service: US mail. 24-6137 --[Edited 07/15/2024 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/15/24] JB | ||
[11104740] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 07/15/2024. 24-6137 | ||
[11104583] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/15/2024. Fee, Docketing statement, Transcript order form and Notice of appearance due 07/29/2024 for Nancy Stark. Disclosure statement and Notice of appearance due on 07/29/2024 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. 24-6137 | ||
Att: 1 19 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil | ||
3 pgs [11104658] Entry of appearance filed by Joshua Bachrach for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/15/2024. Manner of Service: Email 24-6137 |