Rupert Baptiste v. Fatou Jallow
Original Case: 2:16-cv-04593
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-02888 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
FATOU JALLOW
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FATOU JALLOW
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RUPERT BAPTISTE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/13/2024 3:56 AM EST |
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Rupert Baptiste in District Court No. 2-16-cv-04593. (JK) | ||
Att: 1 11 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs District Court Letter Order | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) |