Oliver, et al. v Navy Federal Credit Union
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-01731 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 15:1691 Equal Credit Opportunity Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jun 14, 2024 6:45 AM EDT |
Consolidated Plaintiff
Dennis Walker
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Marie Pereda
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Bob Otondi
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
John Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Christina Hill
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Charles Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Carl Carr
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Constantina Batchelor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elise Simone Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cherelle Jacob
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Masheeha Hopper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristoffer Hicks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laquita Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 08/13 7:41 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/8/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
136 | 136
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 08/08 2:43 PM
USCA Mandate re62 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered July 17, 2024, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Sbro, ) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
135 | 135
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Mon 08/05 7:23 AM
ORDERED that the parties contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick, who is assigned to this civil action, to schedule a settlement conference in re134 Motion for Settlement. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/2/2024. (Sbro, ) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
134 | 134
motion
Settlement
Fri 08/02 11:20 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Wilkes Klein, Michaela) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |