Laquita Oliver v. Navy Federal Credit Union
Original Case: 1:23-cv-01731
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01656 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 5:23 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LAQUITA OLIVER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situtated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MASHEEHA HOPPER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARIE PEREDA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DENNIS WALKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CARL CARR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTINA HILL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN JACKSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARLES GARDNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BOB OTONDI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CONSTANTINA BATCHELOR
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 4:18 AM EDT |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-01731-LMB-WEF. Case manager: TBarton. [1001603303] 24-1656 TB [Entered: 07/18/2024 12:54 PM] | |
2 | 2 2 pgs Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 24-188. Record complete? Yes. [1001603320] 24-1656 TB [Entered: 07/18/2024 01:01 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs FEE NOTICE issued to Glenn Edward Chappell, Andrea Rifka Gold, Adam J. Levitt, Fernando Peter Silva, II, Hassan A. Zavareei - after grant of permission to appeal. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-01731-LMB-WEF. [1001603322] 24-1656 TB [Entered: 07/18/2024 01:03 PM] | |
4 | 4 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-01731-LMB-WEF. [1001603325] 24-1656 TB [Entered: 07/18/2024 01:04 PM] |