Villecco v. Barela, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-02403
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01008 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2024 4:09 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH M. BARELA, in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP E. SPESSHARDT, in his official capacity as Director of the Division of Unemployment Insurance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/27/2024 4:09 AM MDT |
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
[11057251] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/05/2023. Fee or ifp forms due 02/07/2024 for Michael Villecco. Notice of appearance due on 01/22/2024 for Joseph M. Barela and Philip E. Spesshardt, and Notice of appearance due on 02/07/2024 for Michael Villecco. 24-1008 | ||
Att: 1 17 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se |