Villecco v. Barela, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-02403
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01102 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 4:09 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH M. BARELA, in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP E. SPESSHARDT, in his official capacity as Director of the Division of Unemployment Insurance, Colorado Department of Labor and and Employment
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 13 2024
[11097448] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [24-1098, 24-1099, 24-1102, 24-1105] |
Docket last updated: 06/15/2024 4:09 AM MDT |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
[11073821] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/12/2024 Fee or ifp forms due 04/12/2024 for Michael Villecco. Notice of appearance due on 03/27/2024 for Joseph M. Barela and Philip E. Spesshardt, and Notice of appearance due on 04/12/2024 for Michael Villecco 24-1102 | ||
Att: 1 15 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se |