Member Case
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-40158

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Noah G Hillen
Case #: 8:24-bk-40160
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
East Valley Cattle, LLC
471 N 300 W
Jerome, ID 83338-5078
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
550 West Fort St, Ste 698
Boise, ID 83724


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
48 48 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 04/22 9:48 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for March Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
47 47 24 pgs misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 03/21 4:21 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for February Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
46 46 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 02/24 3:18 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for January Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
45 45 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Wed 01/22 4:54 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for December Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
44 44 23 pgs misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 12/24 11:36 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for November Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
43 43 22 pgs misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 11/25 3:45 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for October Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
42 42 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Thu 10/24 10:44 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for September Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
41 41 2 pgs misc Amended Schedule[s] Wed 10/09 1:06 PM
Amended Schedule[s] for Non-Individual D - Amount $814,306,226.70,. Creditors are not being added to the list of creditors. Description of Amendment: Schedule D (Eagle Creek Northwest LLC claim amount amended) Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
40 40 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Thu 10/03 2:17 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for August Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
39 39 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 08/30 5:00 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for July Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
38 38 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 07/22 5:26 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for June Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
37 37 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 06/21 7:26 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for May Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
36 36 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 05/21 4:50 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for April Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
35 35 misc Signature page(s) Mon 04/29 1:57 PM
Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 23 Schedule[s],24 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury,26 Equity Security Holders,30 Notice
Friday, April 26, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 11:42 AM
Notice of Appearance by Tirzah R. Roussell Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Roussell, Tirzah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 3:41 PM
Notice of Appearance by Zachary Fairlie Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (Fairlie, Zachary)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 3:35 PM
Notice of Appearance by John O'Brien Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (O'Brien, John)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 3:25 PM
Notice of Appearance by Scott C Powers Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (Powers, Scott)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice Thu 04/25 1:04 PM
Notice of Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 10:53 AM
Notice of Appearance by Sheila Rae Schwager Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
28 28 2 pgs misc Corporate Resolution Statement Wed 04/24 9:59 AM
Corporate Resolution Statement Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
27 27 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 04/23 4:11 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 04/23 4:10 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC Related [+]. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
25 25 1 pgs misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities Tue 04/23 4:09 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC Related [+]. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
24 24 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Tue 04/23 4:08 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Schedule[s] (Not Amended) Tue 04/23 4:07 PM
Schedule[s] for Non-Individual A/B - Real Property Amount $345,540,000.00, Personal Property Amount $107,022,929.81, D - Amount $814,306,226.70, E/F - Priority Unsecured Claims Amount $0.00, NonPriority Unsecured Claims Amount $0.00, G, H, Statement of Financial Affairs,. Creditors are not being added to the list of creditors. Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 4:22 PM
Notice of Appearance by Adam Aiken Lewis Filed by Creditor East Valley Development, LLC. (Lewis, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
21 21 order Joint Administration Tue 04/16 10:18 AM
Order Granting Debtors' Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 8:24-bk-40158 with Member Case 8:24-bk-40160 Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2024. (kll)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/10 10:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
19 19 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Mon 04/08 2:28 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/10/2024 at 09:00 AM (Mountain Time) via Teleconference. See Notice for info. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/9/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 6/11/2024.Government Proof of Claim Date 9/30/2024. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents Fri 04/05 10:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice Fri 04/05 10:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 04/05 2:06 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Miranda Russell by Judge Noah G. Hillen U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register to file electronically in the District of Idaho. This Order has been served on Miranda Russell at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 4/5/2024. (ad)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/05 1:37 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice([LINK 24-40160 NGH] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 250.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8312610. Fee amount 250.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#14
Thursday, April 04, 2024
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 12:33 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Miranda Russell) Filed by Creditor East Valley Development, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ynard, Janine
13 13 court Court's Certificate of Service Thu 04/04 10:34 AM
Court's Certificate of Service re 12 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Adam A. Lewis at the address on record. Related [+] (ck)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Creditor East Valley Development, LLC
12 12 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 04/04 10:33 AM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Adam A. Lewis by Judge Noah G. Hillen U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register to file electronically in the District of Idaho. This Order has been served on Adam A. Lewis at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 4/4/2024. (ck)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
11 11 misc Signature page(s) Wed 04/03 3:59 PM
Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11), Corrective Entry regarding signature page(s)
10 10 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 04/03 3:58 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 04/03 3:33 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice([LINK 24-40160 NGH] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 250.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8310967. Fee amount 250.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#8
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 2:29 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Adam Lewis) Filed by Creditor East Valley Development, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ynard, Janine
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 12:31 PM
Notice of Appearance by Janine Patrice Reynard Filed by Creditor East Valley Development, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynard, Janine
6 6 utility Set Deficiency Deadlines Wed 04/03 11:29 AM
Set Deficiency Deadlines - Income and Expense Statement due 4/16/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due 4/16/2024. Corporate Resolution Statement due 4/16/2024. (ck)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 11:27 AM
Notice of Appearance by David A Coleman Filed by Creditor Eagle Creek Northwest LLC. (Coleman, David)
Related: [-]
utility Corrective Entry - Signature Page(s) Wed 04/03 10:37 AM
Corrective Action: You are receiving this notice because the original signature page was not filed at the same time as the electronically filed document. Please file the signature page for the Voluntary Petition page 4, electronically through ECF. For further information/procedures, visit our website at www.id.uscourts.gov. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 4/8/2024. (ck)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC
utility Corrective Entry Wed 04/03 11:03 AM
Corrective Action: Please file the 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors separately using the correct event code: Bankruptcy / Other / 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 4/8/2024. (ck)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 trustee Chapter 11 Guidelines Tue 04/02 3:27 PM
Chapter 11 Guidelines Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee. (Cahoon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 04/02 2:35 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-40160 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8309569. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 motion Joint Administration Tue 04/02 2:09 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor East Valley Cattle, LLC (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/02 12:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by East Valley Cattle, LLC Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/16/2024.Balance Sheet Due 04/16/2024.Cash Flow Statement Due 04/16/2024.Certificate of Credit Counseling due 04/16/2024. Statement of Domestic Support due 04/16/2024.Employee Income Records due 04/16/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 04/16/2024.Initial Statement About an Eviction Judgment Against You (Form 101A) due 04/16/2024.Federal Income Tax Return Due 04/16/2024.Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 04/16/2024. Schedule A/B due 04/16/2024. Schedule C due 04/16/2024. Schedule D due 04/16/2024. Schedule E/F due 04/16/2024. Schedule G due 04/16/2024. Schedule H due 04/16/2024. Schedule I due 04/16/2024. Schedule J due 04/16/2024. Schedule J-2 due 04/16/2024. Schedules A/B-J due 04/16/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/16/2024.Statement of Operations Due: 04/16/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/16/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/16/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2024. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]