Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Noah G Hillen
Case #: 8:24-bk-40158
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Millenkamp Cattle, Inc
471 N 300 W
Jerome, ID 83338-5078
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
550 West Fort St, Ste 698
Boise, ID 83724


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1141 1141 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 4:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC Related [+]. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1132 Order (Generic),1138 Disclosure Statement,1139 Amended Chapter 11 Plan
1140 1140 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/29 2:48 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC Related [+]. Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/2/2025 at 09:00 AM via Boise - US Courthouse, Courtroom 5 - Judge Hillen. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-] 880 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC.,1023 Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC (RE: related document(s)880 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2),1139 Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC (RE: related document(s)880 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC.,1023 Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC (RE: related document(s)880 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2)).
1139 1139 110 pgs plan Amended Chapter 11 Plan Tue 04/29 2:39 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC Related [+]. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-] 880 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC.,1023 Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC (RE: related document(s)880 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2)
1138 1138 plan Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 2:32 PM
Disclosure Statement Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC.(Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Plan
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Liquidation Analysis
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Budget
Att: 4 Exhibit D. GUC List
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Org Chart
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Lease Schedule
1137 1137 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 10:56 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1133 Order (Generic),1135 Amended Disclosure Statement
1136 1136 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/29 8:59 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc Related [+]. Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/2/2025 at 09:00 AM via Boise - US Courthouse, Courtroom 5 - Judge Hillen. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 991 Amended Chapter 11 Plan (Fourth Amended) Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc (RE: related document(s)965 Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc (RE: related document(s)888 Amended Chapter 11 Plan Second Amended Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc (RE: related document(s)776 Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc (RE: related document(s)641 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc (RE: related document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Millenkamp Cattle, Inc List of Equity Security Holders due 04/16/2024. Schedule A/B due 04/16/2024. Schedule D due 04/16/2024. Schedule E/F due 04/16/2024. Schedule G due 04/16/2024. Schedule H due 04/16/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/16/2024.Statement of Operations Due: 04/16/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/16/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2024. Income and Expense Statement due 04/16/2024. Corporate Resolution Stmt due 04/16/2024. Corporate Ownership Stmt due 04/16/2024.).).).).).
1135 1135 312 pgs plan Amended Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 8:58 AM
Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 640 WITHDRAWN see docket706 Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc (RE: related document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Millenkamp Cattle, Inc List of Equity Security Holders due 04/16/2024. Schedule A/B due 04/16/2024. Schedule D due 04/16/2024. Schedule E/F due 04/16/2024. Schedule G due 04/16/2024. Schedule H due 04/16/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/16/2024.Statement of Operations Due: 04/16/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/16/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2024. Income and Expense Statement due 04/16/2024. Corporate Resolution Stmt due 04/16/2024. Corporate Ownership Stmt due 04/16/2024.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Liquidation Analysis # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Financial Projections/Budget # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Exit Term Loan Facility Term Sheet # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - List of General Unsecured Claims # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Organizational Summary Chart # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases)(Mikkilineni, Krystal) Modified on 11/12/2024 (kll).
Monday, April 28, 2025
1134 1134 2 pgs order Order Application for Interim Professional Compensation Mon 04/28 4:12 PM
Order Approving In Part Givens Pursley LLP's Second Application for Interim Professional Fees and Costs Related [+]for Givens Pursley LLP, fees awarded: $33,349.00, expenses awarded: $467.33 Signed on 4/28/2025. (kll)
Related: [-] 994
1133 1133 30+ pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 04/28 3:10 PM
Order Conditionally Approving Debtors' Disclosure Statement and Approval of Matters Ancillary to Solicitaion: Signed on 4/28/2025 Related [+]. (kll)
Related: [-] 992 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc
1132 1132 38 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 04/28 3:04 PM
Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Approval of Matters Ancillary to Solicitation. Signed on 4/28/2025 Related [+]. (kll)
Related: [-] 1024 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC
1131 1131 30+ pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 04/28 2:34 PM
**DISREGARD- entered in error** Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Approval of Matters Ancillary to Solicitation: Signed on 4/28/2025 Related [+]. (kll)Modified on 4/28/2025 (kll)
Related: [-] 1024 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC
Sunday, April 27, 2025
1130 1130 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/27 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
1129 1129 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order Fri 04/25 10:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
1128 1128 12 pgs motion Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Fri 04/25 4:04 PM
Application to Employ Eric M. Haggerty of Sterling Ag Management, LLC as Financial Consultant . Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc Objections due by 05/19/2025. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Declaration of Eric M. Haggerty
1127 1127 12 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 04/25 3:39 PM
Order Sustaining Inpart and Overruling In Part (1) Disclosure Statement for Fourth Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Millenkamp Cattle, INC. And its Related Affiliates and (2) Disclosure Statement for Plan Proponents Amended Plan of Reorganization for Millenkamp Cattle, INC. And its Related Affiliates Dated April 1,2025. Signed on 4/25/2025 Related [+]. (kll)
Related: [-] 992 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc
1126 1126 court Transcript Fri 04/25 1:26 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/16/2025 RE: Oral Ruling. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 07/24/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [Court Reporter/Transcriber Tamara A. Weber, Telephone number 208 899 2177.] Purchasing Party: Janine Reynard Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 05/2/2025. Redaction Request Due By 05/16/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 05/27/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/24/2025. (Weber, Tamara)
Related: [-] 1090 Hearing Held Appearances: No appearances taken by the Court. Report of Proceedings: Oral Ruling regarding Creditor East Valley Development LLC Second Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Proceed with Arbitration, Doc. No. 978 in Main Bankruptcy Proceeding 24-40158 NGH Millenkamp Cattle, Inc. and Defendant's Motion to Compel (I) Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint and (II) Grant Stay Relief to Proceed with Arbitration Doc. No. 6 in Adversary Proceeding 25-08003 NGH Millenkamp Cattle, Inc et al v. East Valley Development, LLC. The Court orally enters findings and conclusions. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint and DENIES in PART the Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay as stated on the record. An order by the Court shall be forthcoming. The Court schedules a Status Hearing in the Adversary Proceeding to be heard on April 23, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. The parties shall call Judge Hillens Conference Number: 1-669-254-5252; Meeting ID: 160 5422 0978 Audio File Location: Zoom-Telephone (RE: related document(s)978 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor East Valley Development, LLC) (mb)
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1125 1125 motion Stipulation Thu 04/24 8:53 PM
Stipulation Between Debtors and Rabo re Disclosure Statement Objections Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1124 1124 5 pgs motion Stipulation Thu 04/24 8:53 PM
Stipulation Between Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Rooster Capital IV LLC and Rabo AgriFinance LLC Resolving Objections to Plan Proponents' Disclosure Statement for Plan Proponents' Amended Plan of Reorganization for Millenkamp Cattle, Inc. and its Related Affiliates Dated April 21, 2015 Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC. (Wilson, Brent)
Related: [-]
1123 1123 motion Stipulation Thu 04/24 4:58 PM
Stipulation Between Debtors and Conterra re Conterra Objections to Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1122 1122 2 pgs order Enforce Thu 04/24 8:46 AM
Order On Debtors' Motion to Enforce The Automatic Stay Related [+] Signed on 4/23/2025. (kll)
Related: [-] 1076
1121 1121 1 pgs audio Thu 04/24 6:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/23/2025 05:03:23 PM]. File Size [ 54443 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:59:33 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
1120 1120 2 pgs court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Wed 04/23 4:25 PM
Hearing Held Report of Proceedings: Please refer to the attached PDF for Hearing Mintues Audio File Location: Zoom-Telephone Related [+] (mb)
Related: [-] 978 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor East Valley Development, LLC,992 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc,1024 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC,1076 Motion to Enforce filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc
1119 1119 3 pgs order Stipulated Order Wed 04/23 12:18 PM
Order Referring Case to Settlement Judge Related [+] Signed on 4/23/2025. (kll)
Related: [-] 1098
1118 1118 misc Request for Transcript Wed 04/23 11:28 AM
Transcript Request (oral ruling) . Request made for proceedings held on 04/16/2025. Requested by:Janine P Reynard. Filed by Creditor East Valley Development, LLC Related [+].
Related: [-] 1092 ynard, Janine
1117 1117 6 pgs misc Supplement Wed 04/23 11:27 AM
Supplement to (Second Supplement to 4th Amended Disclosure Statement) Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 992 Amended Disclosure Statement
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1116 1116 1 pgs audio Wed 04/23 6:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/22/2025 02:18:36 PM]. File Size [ 39581 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:50:50 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
1115 1115 5 pgs misc Objection to Professional Fees Tue 04/22 2:16 PM
Objection to Professional Fees Related [+] Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1000 1000 Amended Application for Compensation of First and Final Application for Allowance and Payment of Compensation and Designation as a 503 (b)(2) Administrative Expense Claim for The Forbes Securities Group LLC, DBA Forbes Partners as Investment
1114 1114 court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Tue 04/22 12:14 PM
Hearing Held Appearances: Matthew Christensen - Counsel for Debtor-in-Possession; Alex Caval Counsel for William and Susan Millenkamp; Ron C Bingham and Kimbell Gourley - Counsel for Creditors MetLife Real Estate Lending LLC Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; Francisco Vazquez and Sheila Schwager - Counsel for Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC; John O'Brien and Scott Powers - Counsel for Conterra Holdings, LLC; Richard Bernard and John Kurtz - Counsel for Interested Party Sandton Capital Partners LP; Miranda Russell - Counsel for Creditor East Valley Development; Matthew Kremer - Counsel for Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors; Brett Cahoon - Representing the United States Trustee Report of Proceedings: Debtors Motion for Entry of An Order Enforcing the Automatic Stay and Blocking Efforts to Foreclose on Equity Interests in the Debtors, Doc. No. 1076 and Opposition Thereto. Arguments presented. Debtors Disclosure Statement for Fourth Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Millenkamp Cattle, Inc. and Its Related Affiliates, Doc. No. 992 and Opposition Thereto. Arguments presented. Creditor Rabo AgriFinance, LLC Disclosure Statement for Plan Proponents Amended Plan of Reorganization of Millenkamp Cattle, Inc. and Its Related Affiliates, Dated April 1, 2025, Doc. No. 1024 and Opposition Thereto. Arguments presented. The Court takes the matters under advisement. An Oral Ruling on all matters shall be heard on April 23, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. Mountain Time Telephonic. The Status Hearing in Adversary Proceeding 25-08003 NGH Millenkamp Cattle, Inc et al v. East Valley Development, LLC scheduled to be heard on April 23, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. Mountain Time shall also be heard telephonically. The parties shall call Judge Hillens Conference Number: 1-669-254-5252; Meeting ID: 160 5422 0978 Audio File Location: BOI-CTRM5 Related [+] (mb)
Related: [-] 992 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc,1024 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC,1076 Motion to Enforce filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc
1113 1113 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 04/22 10:28 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002-2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number1000 . Filed by Broker The Forbes Securities Group LLC, DBA Forbes Partners as Investment Banker Related [+]. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-] 1000 Amended Application for Compensation of First and Final Application for Allowance and Payment of Compensation and Designation as a 503 (b)(2) Administrative Expense Claim for The Forbes Securities Group LLC, DBA Forbes Partners as Investment
1112 1112 12 pgs misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 04/22 10:03 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for March Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Cattle, Inc. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 84 pgs Part 2
Att: 2 90 pgs Part 3
Att: 3 Part 4
Att: 4 43 pgs Part 5