Member Case
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-40158

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Noah G Hillen
Case #: 8:24-bk-40161
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.
471 N 300 W
Jerome, ID 83338-5078
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
550 West Fort St, Ste 698
Boise, ID 83724


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
41 41 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 04/22 9:53 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for March Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
40 40 24 pgs misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 03/24 8:48 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for February Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
39 39 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 02/24 3:30 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for January Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
38 38 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Wed 01/22 4:55 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for December Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
37 37 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 12/24 11:37 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for November Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
36 36 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 11/25 3:46 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for October Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
35 35 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Thu 10/24 10:42 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for September Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
34 34 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Thu 10/03 2:22 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for August Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
33 33 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 08/30 5:06 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for July Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
32 32 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 07/22 5:39 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for June Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
utility Corrective Entry Tue 06/25 7:53 AM
Corrective Action: Counsel to please refile this motion in the main Bankruptcy case 24-40158 Please use the correct caption when it is refiled, as stated in docket 13 . Related [+] Corrective Action due by 7/1/2024. (kll)
Related: [-] 28 Ex Parte Motion For Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Brandy Bartholomew
utility Corrective Entry Tue 06/25 7:54 AM
Corrective Action: Counsel to please refile your objection in the main bankruptcy case 24-40158 once the motion has been refiled in the correct case. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 7/1/2024. (kll)
Related: [-] 31 Objection to Motion for Relief from Stay and Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.
Monday, June 24, 2024
31 31 notice Objection to Motion for Relief from Stay and Notice of Hearing Mon 06/24 2:05 PM
Objection to Motion for Relief from Stay and Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C. Related [+]. Motion for Relief hearing to be held on 7/18/2024 at 01:30 PM Boise - US Courthouse, Courtroom 5 - Judge Hillen for28 , (Roussell, Tirzah)
Related: [-] 28 Ex Parte Motion for Relief from Stay Fee Amount $199,
Friday, June 21, 2024
30 30 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 06/21 7:31 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for May Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
29 29 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/10 2:03 PM
Receipt of Ex Parte Motion For Relief From Stay([LINK 24-40161 NGH] ) [motion,mxstprlf] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8358167. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#28
28 28 motion Ex Parte Motion For Relief From Stay Mon 06/10 2:01 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Relief from Stay Fee Amount $199, Filed by Creditor Brandy Bartholomew Last day to Object 07/1/2024. (Clark, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
27 27 misc Amended Schedule[s] Fri 05/31 3:24 PM
Amended Schedule[s] for Non-Individual A/B - Real Property Amount $37,720,000.00, Personal Property Amount $99.32,. Description of Amendment: Schedule A/B, Part 9 Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Roussell, Tirzah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
26 26 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 05/21 5:20 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for April Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
25 25 misc Signature page(s) Mon 04/29 1:32 PM
Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C. Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 14 Schedule[s],15 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury,17 Equity Security Holders
Friday, April 26, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 11:54 AM
Notice of Appearance by Tirzah R. Roussell Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Roussell, Tirzah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 4:05 PM
Notice of Appearance by Zachary Fairlie Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (Fairlie, Zachary)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 4:01 PM
Notice of Appearance by John O'Brien Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (O'Brien, John)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 3:55 PM
Notice of Appearance by Scott C Powers Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (Powers, Scott)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 10:54 AM
Notice of Appearance by Sheila Rae Schwager Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
19 19 misc Corporate Resolution Statement Wed 04/24 10:10 AM
Corporate Resolution Statement Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
18 18 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 04/23 4:53 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 04/23 4:52 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C. Related [+]. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
16 16 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities Tue 04/23 4:51 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C. Related [+]. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
15 15 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Tue 04/23 4:51 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Schedule[s] (Not Amended) Tue 04/23 4:50 PM
Schedule[s] for Non-Individual A/B - Real Property Amount $37,050,000.00, Personal Property Amount $99.32, D - Amount $678,236,666.28, E/F - Priority Unsecured Claims Amount $0.00, NonPriority Unsecured Claims Amount $0.00, G, H, Statement of Financial Affairs,. Creditors are not being added to the list of creditors. Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
13 13 order Joint Administration Tue 04/16 10:20 AM
Order Granting Debtors' Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 8:24-bk-40158 with Member Case 8:24-bk-40161 Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2024. (kll)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/10 10:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
11 11 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Mon 04/08 2:37 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/10/2024 at 09:00 AM (Mountain Time) via Teleconference. See Notice for info. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/9/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 6/11/2024.Government Proof of Claim Date 9/30/2024. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents Fri 04/05 10:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice Fri 04/05 10:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Amended Voluntary Petition Fri 04/05 10:47 AM
Amended Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
7 7 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 04/03 11:56 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Signature page(s) Wed 04/03 11:55 AM
Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C. Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11), Corrective Entry regarding signature page(s)
5 5 utility Set Deficiency Deadlines Wed 04/03 11:27 AM
Set Deficiency Deadlines - Income and Expense Statement due 4/16/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due 4/16/2024. Corporate Resolution Statement due 4/16/2024. (ck)
Related: [-]
utility Corrective Entry - Signature Page(s) Wed 04/03 11:00 AM
Corrective Action: You are receiving this notice because the original signature page was not filed at the same time as the electronically filed document. Please file the signature page for the Voluntary Petition page 4, electronically through ECF. For further information/procedures, visit our website at www.id.uscourts.gov. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 4/8/2024. (ck)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.
utility Corrective Entry Wed 04/03 11:02 AM
Corrective Action: Please file the 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors separately using the correct event code: Bankruptcy / Other / 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 4/8/2024. (ck)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C.
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 trustee Chapter 11 Guidelines Tue 04/02 3:31 PM
Chapter 11 Guidelines Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee. (Cahoon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 04/02 2:35 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-40161 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8309569. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 motion Joint Administration Tue 04/02 2:10 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/02 12:56 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Millenkamp Properties, L.L.C. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/16/2024.Balance Sheet Due 04/16/2024.Cash Flow Statement Due 04/16/2024.Certificate of Credit Counseling due 04/16/2024. Statement of Domestic Support due 04/16/2024.Employee Income Records due 04/16/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 04/16/2024.Initial Statement About an Eviction Judgment Against You (Form 101A) due 04/16/2024.Federal Income Tax Return Due 04/16/2024.Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 04/16/2024. Schedule A/B due 04/16/2024. Schedule C due 04/16/2024. Schedule D due 04/16/2024. Schedule E/F due 04/16/2024. Schedule G due 04/16/2024. Schedule H due 04/16/2024. Schedule I due 04/16/2024. Schedule J due 04/16/2024. Schedule J-2 due 04/16/2024. Schedules A/B-J due 04/16/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/16/2024.Statement of Operations Due: 04/16/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/16/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/16/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2024. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]