Goose Ranch LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-40158
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-40158
Idaho Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Noah G Hillen |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-40164 |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Goose Ranch LLCGoose Ranch
471 N 300 W
Jerome, ID 83338-5078 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
550 West Fort St, Ste 698
Boise, ID 83724 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for March Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for February Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for January Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for December Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, December 24, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for November Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for October Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for September Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for August Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for July Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for June Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for May Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for April Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC . (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Appearance by Tirzah R. Roussell Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Roussell, Tirzah) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Appearance by Zachary Fairlie Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (Fairlie, Zachary) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Appearance by John O'Brien Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (O'Brien, John) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Appearance by Scott C Powers Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (Powers, Scott) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Appearance by Sheila Rae Schwager Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC. (Schwager, Sheila) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Corporate Resolution Statement Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC . (Mikkilineni, Krystal) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Schedule[s] for Non-Individual A/B - Real Property Amount $10,265,000.00, Personal Property Amount $0.00, D - Amount $656,750,643.24, E/F - Priority Unsecured Claims Amount $0.00, NonPriority Unsecured Claims Amount $0.00, G, H, Statement of Financial Affairs,. Creditors are not being added to the list of creditors. Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Granting Debtors' Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 8:24-bk-40158 with Member Case 8:24-bk-40164 Signed on 4/16/2024. (kll) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/10/2024 at 09:00 AM (Mountain Time) via Teleconference. See Notice for info. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/9/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 6/11/2024.Government Proof of Claim Date 9/30/2024. (ad) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC . (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Set Deficiency Deadlines - Income and Expense Statement due 4/17/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due 4/17/2024. Corporate Resolution Statement due 4/17/2024. (ef) |
|
utility
Corrective Entry - Signature Page(s)
Wed 04/03 11:42 AM
Corrective Action: You are receiving this notice because the original signature page was not filed at the same time as the electronically filed document. Please file the signature page for the Voluntary Petition page 4, electronically through ECF. For further information/procedures, visit our website at www.id.uscourts.gov. Corrective Action due by 4/8/2024. (ef) |
||
utility
Corrective Entry
Wed 04/03 11:43 AM
Corrective Action: Form 204 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Claims needs to be refiled separately under correct event code Corrective Action due by 4/8/2024. (ef) |
||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Chapter 11 Guidelines Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee. (Cahoon, Brett) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 04/02 2:35 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-40164 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8309569. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Goose Ranch LLCGoose Ranch (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Goose Ranch LLCGoose Ranch Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/16/2024.Balance Sheet Due 04/16/2024.Cash Flow Statement Due 04/16/2024.Certificate of Credit Counseling due 04/16/2024. Statement of Domestic Support due 04/16/2024.Employee Income Records due 04/16/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 04/16/2024.Initial Statement About an Eviction Judgment Against You (Form 101A) due 04/16/2024.Federal Income Tax Return Due 04/16/2024.Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 04/16/2024. Schedule A/B due 04/16/2024. Schedule C due 04/16/2024. Schedule D due 04/16/2024. Schedule E/F due 04/16/2024. Schedule G due 04/16/2024. Schedule H due 04/16/2024. Schedule I due 04/16/2024. Schedule J due 04/16/2024. Schedule J-2 due 04/16/2024. Schedules A/B-J due 04/16/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/16/2024.Statement of Operations Due: 04/16/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/16/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/16/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2024. (Christensen, Matthew) |